EP2145613 - Infiltrant for dental application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ernst Mühlbauer GmbH & Co.KG Koogstraat 4 25870 Norderfriedrichskoog / DE | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neffgen, Stephan Boltensalle 2 22459 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Neander, Swen Turmweg 3b 20148 Hamburg / DE | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08011903.5 | 02.07.2008 | [2010/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145613 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/08, A61K6/083 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
C08F22/10 (US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | Infiltrant für die Dentalapplikation | [2010/03] | English: | Infiltrant for dental application | [2010/03] | French: | Infiltrant pour l'application dentaire | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 02.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 19.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1913927 (MUEHLBAUER ERNST GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * page 6, paragraphs 32,36 *; | [A]WO2007131725 (CHARITE UNIVERSITAETSMEDIZIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,7-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 4 * * page 13, paragraphs 4,5 *; | [A] - MEYER-LUECKEL ET AL, "Influence of the application time on the penetration of different dental adhesives and a fissure sealant into artificial subsurface lesions in bovine enamel", DENTAL MATERIALS, ELSEVIER, (20060101), vol. 22, no. 1, ISSN 0109-5641, pages 22 - 28, XP005214018 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dental.2005.03.005 | by applicant | WO2007131725 | EP1413569 | EP1741419 | EP1688125 | WO2005086911 | WO02066535 | WO2005121200 | WO02062901 | WO2006031972 | EP1714633 | EP1285947 | EP1849450 | US2004017928 | - FAN P. L. ET AL., "Penetrativity of sealants", J. DENT. RES., (1975), vol. 54, pages 262 - 264 | - Literatur, ELSEVIER APPL. SCI. PUBL., (1984), vol. 2 |