EP2012455 - Apparatus and method determining a transport block size [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishikati, Ryuichiro c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Töpken, Enno Glawe. Delfs. Moll Postbox 26 01 62 80058 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012042.1 | 03.07.2008 | [2009/02] | Priority number, date | JP20070176958 | 05.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007176958 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2012455 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2012455 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L1/20 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
H04L1/0026 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0007 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0015 (EP,KR,US);
H04B2201/70722 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/02] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/24] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Bestimmen einer Transportblockgrösse | [2009/02] | English: | Apparatus and method determining a transport block size | [2009/02] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour déterminer la dimension d'un bloc de transport | [2009/02] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 04.04.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006093024 (PIETRASKI PHILIP J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9-12,15,18,19 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0 17] , [0 19] - [0029] - [0051] - [0054] * [I] 4,5,7,8,13,14,16,17; | [I]US2006291429 (MATUSZ PAWEL O [PL]) [I] 1-19 * abstract * * figures 2,7 * * paragraph [0014] * * claims 1-3 *; | [A] - SOO-YONG JEON ET AL, "Channel Adaptive CQI Reporting Schemes for UMTS High-Speed Downlink Packet Access", 2006 IEEE 64TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE : VTC 2006-FALL ; 25 - 28 SEPTEMBER 2006, MONTREAL, QUEBEC, CANADA, PISCATAWAY, NJ : IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, (20060901), ISBN 978-1-4244-0062-1, pages 1 - 5, XP031051251 [A] 1-19 * figure 1 * * abstract * * section I, Introduction * * section VI, Conclusions * | Examination | US2006034175 |