EP2141614 - Method and device for logging browser events indicative of reading behaviour [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilgers, Philipp v. Strelitzer Strasse 16 10115 Berlin / DE | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Bach, Alexander, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Bach, Alexander, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Bach, Alexander Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012046.2 | 03.07.2008 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2141614 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
G06F16/958 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/36] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufzeichnen von Browser Events des Leseverhaltens | [2010/01] | English: | Method and device for logging browser events indicative of reading behaviour | [2010/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'enregistrement d'événements de navigateur liés au comportement se produisant pendant une lecture | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 07.07.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.08.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/30] | 07.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US6873314 (CAMPBELL CHRISTOPHER S [US], et al) [DA] 1-15 * abstract *; | [DX]US2007255754 (GHEEL JAMES [GB]) [DX] 1-15 * abstract *; | [DX]WO2008049403 (SIRVALUSE CONSULTING GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1-15 * abstract * | [DX] - R ATTERER, M WNUK, A SCHMIDT, Knowing the User's Every Move - User Activity Tracking for Website Usability Evaluation and Implicit Interaction, EDINBURGH, UNITED KINGDOM, WWW 2006 CONFERENCE, (20060522), XP002519605 [DX] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1135777.1135811 | [DX] - H WEINREICH, H OBENDORF, E HERDER, M MAYER, Off the beaten Tracks: Exploring Three Aspects of Web Navigation, EDINBURGH, UNITED KINGDOM, WWW 2006 CONFERENCE, (20060522), XP002519606 [DX] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1135777.1135802 | by applicant | US6873314 | US2007255754 | WO2008049403 | - "Off the beaten Tracks: Exploring Three Aspects of Web Navigation", HARALD WEINREICH ET AL., Proceedings of World Wide Web Conference, ACM PRESS, (2006), pages 133 - 142 |