EP2019203 - Wind turbine blade with cambering flaps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gamesa Innovation & Technology, S.L. Avenida Ciudad de la Innovación 9-11 31621 Sarriguren / ES | [2018/51] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states Gamesa Innovation & Technology, S.L. Avenida Ciudad de la Innovación 9-11 31621 Sarriguren / ES | ||
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states Gamesa Innovation & Technology, S.L. Avenida Ciudad de la Innovación 9-11 31612 Sarriguren Navarra / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rebsdorf, Anders Gamesa Wind Engineering APS Vejlsovej, 51 8600 Silkeborg / DK | 02 /
Friedrich, Michael Gamesa Wind Engineering APS Vejlsovej, 51 8600 Silkeborg / DK | 03 /
Meldgaard, Christian Gamesa Wind Engineering APS Vejlsovej, 51 8600 Silkeborg / DK | [2016/08] |
Former [2009/05] | 01 /
Rebsdorf, Anders Gamesa Wind Engineering APS Vejlsovej, 51 8600 Silkeborg / DK | ||
02 /
Friedrich, Michael Gamesa Wind Engineering APS Vejlsovej, 51 8600 Silkeborg / DK | |||
03 /
Meldgaard, Christian Gamesa Wind Engineering APS Vejlsovej, 51 8600 Silkeborg / DK | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2018/51] | Application number, filing date | 08012154.4 | 04.07.2008 | [2009/05] | Priority number, date | ES20070002050 | 23.07.2007 Original published format: ES 200702050 | [2009/05] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2019203 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2019203 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2019203 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2019203 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06, F03D7/02 | [2013/07] | CPC: |
F03D1/0641 (EP,US);
F03D1/0608 (ES);
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
F03D7/0224 (ES);
F03D7/0232 (EP,US);
F05B2240/301 (EP,US);
F05B2240/3052 (EP);
F05B2240/311 (EP,US);
F05B2260/50 (EP,US);
F05B2270/331 (EP,US);
F05B2270/404 (EP,US);
F05B2270/605 (EP,US);
F05B2280/2001 (EP,US);
F05B2280/4003 (EP,US);
F05B2280/6003 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/05] | F03D1/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2013/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, LI | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rotorblatt einer Windenergieanlage mit gewölbten Klappen | [2018/26] | English: | Wind turbine blade with cambering flaps | [2009/05] | French: | Pale d'éolienne avec des volets cambrés | [2018/26] |
Former [2009/05] | Rotorblatt einer Windenergieanlage mit gewölbten Klappen | ||
Former [2009/05] | Pale d'éolienne avec des volets cambrés | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 14.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE ENERCON GmbH Dreekamp 5 26605 Aurich / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2017/01] | 05.01.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.05.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.05.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.05.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.06.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.06.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.11.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2008 | AT | 24.02.2016 | BE | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | NL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | NO | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | IE | 04.07.2016 | LU | 04.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.07.2008 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.07.2008 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | HR | 24.02.2016 | |
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]WO2004088130 (FORSKNINGSCT RISOE [DK], et al) [XD] 1,5-7,9,13 * figures 4, 5 * * page 2, line 21 - line 27 * * page 3, line 5 - line 7 * * page 3, line 31 - line 34 * * page 9, line 23 - line 34 * [Y] 2-4 [I] 8,10-12; | [Y]US2753835 (WALTER GEHRIG) [Y] 2-4 * figure 5 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 3 *; | [X]US4137009 (TELFORD JAMES W) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2005103945 (PEREZ-SANCHEZ JUAN [DE]) [A] 1-4 * figures 18a, 18b * | Examination | DE2922885 | US2405208 | by applicant | WO2004088130 | US6769873 | Opposition | DE2922885 | US2405208 | DE19741326 | WO2004088130 | DE10317258 | US1506146 | US2753835 | US3270699 | US8971328 | WO2004108525 | GB835221 | WO9803398 | US6015115 | US6196796 | US5971328 | US6769873 | - H.P. MONNER et al., "Design Aspects of the Adaptive Wing- The Elastic Trailing Edge and the Local Spoiler Bump", Multidisciplinary Design and Optimisation /Proceedings/, Royal Aeronautical Society, (19981026), pages 15.1 - 15.9, ISBN 1 85768 074 X, XP055327089 | - E. STANEWSKY, "Adaptive wing and flow control technology", Progress in Aerospace Sciences, (20011000), vol. 37, pages 583 - 667, XP055327096 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0376-0421(01)00017-3 |