EP1998414 - Sensor which can be connected to a transfer circuit through a connector with means for realising contactless signal transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress + Hauser Conducta GmbH+Co. KG Dieselstrasse 24 70839 Gerlingen / DE | [2016/16] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states Endress+Hauser Conducta Gesellschaft für Mess- und Regeltechnik mbH+Co. KG Dieselstrasse 24 70839 Gerlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pechstein, Torsten, Dr. Wettinstr. 20 01445 Radebeul / DE | 02 /
Scholz, Katrin, Dr. Oberer Eugen 22 09627 Bobritzsch / DE | 03 /
Franzheld, Reiner, Dr. Massanei 37e 04736 Waldheim / DE | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2008/49] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012255.9 | 19.10.2001 | [2008/49] | Priority number, date | DE20001055090 | 07.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10055090 | [2008/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1998414 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1998414 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1998414 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/28, H04B5/00, H01R13/66, H01F38/14 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
G01N27/286 (EP,US);
H04B5/22 (EP,US);
H04B5/24 (EP,US);
Y10S439/95 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/23] | H01R13/66, H01F38/14, G01D11/24, H01R13/52 | ||
Former IPC [2008/49] | H01R13/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2017/01] |
Former [2008/49] | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Sensor, der über einen Steckverbinder mit Mitteln zur Realisierung einer kontaktlosen Signalübertragung an eine Übertragungsleitung anschliessbar ist | [2008/49] | English: | Sensor which can be connected to a transfer circuit through a connector with means for realising contactless signal transfer | [2008/49] | French: | Capteur pouvant être connecté à une ligne de transmission à l'aide d'un connecteur à fiche équipé de moyens de réalisation d'une transmission de signal sans contact | [2008/49] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01124304.5 / EP1206012 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010124304) is 28.09.2004 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   09.12.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | [2017/51] |
Former [2017/40] | NL | 04.01.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4208140 (ROSENBERGER HOCHFREQUENZTECH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 54 *; | [A]EP0676710 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - column 4, line 53 *; | [XI]EP0678880 (PANEX CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 49 - column 9, line 43 * [I] 6; | [A]DE19719730 (BARTEC MESTECHNIK UND SENSORIK [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 18 - line 23 * * column 6, line 51 - column 10, line 37 * | Examination | EP0980603 |