EP2031105 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING A ROTOR DRIVE OF AN OPEN END ROTOR SPINNING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/10] | System for controlling a rotor drive of an open end rotor spinning machine | ||
[2017/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saurer Germany GmbH & Co. KG Leverkuser Strasse 65 42897 Remscheid / DE | [2013/40] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Leverkuser Strasse 65 42897 Remscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meerkamp, Sven Dülkener Straße 84 41747 Viersen / DE | 02 /
Balboul, Nour-Eddine Türnicherstraße 16 50969 Köln / DE | [2017/25] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
Meerkamp, Sven Dülkener Strasse 84 41747 Viersen / DE | ||
02 /
Balboul, Nour-Eddine Türnicherstrasse 16 50969 Köln / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2017/25] |
Former [2013/49] | Hamann, Arndt, et al Saurer Germany GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Carlstraße 60 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | ||
Former [2010/50] | Hamann, Arndt, et al Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Carlstrasse 60 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | ||
Former [2010/50] | Hamann, Arndt Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Landgrafenstraße 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | ||
Former [2009/10] | Hamann, Arndt Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG DS Landgrafenstraße 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012436.5 | 10.07.2008 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | DE20071040216 | 25.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007040216 | [2009/10] | Previously filed application, date | DE20071040216 | 25.08.2007 | [2009/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2031105 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2031105 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2031105 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D01H4/44 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
D01H4/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, IT, TR [2014/47] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINES ROTORANTRIEBES EINER OFFENEND-ROTORSPINNMASCHINE | [2017/15] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING A ROTOR DRIVE OF AN OPEN END ROTOR SPINNING MACHINE | [2017/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE D'UN ENTRAÎNEMENT DE ROTOR D'UNE MACHINE À FILER À ROTOR | [2017/15] |
Former [2009/10] | System zur Ansteuerung eines Rotorantriebes einer Offenend-Rotorspinnmaschine | ||
Former [2009/10] | System for controlling a rotor drive of an open end rotor spinning machine | ||
Former [2009/10] | Système de commande d'un entraînement de rotor d'une machine à filer à rotor | Examination procedure | 11.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 10.10.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.11.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 09.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | TR | 21.06.2017 | [2020/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0184423 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [Y] 1-11* abstract *; | [YD]EP1054086 (RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREI [DE]) [YD] 1-11 * figure 1; claim 1 * |