EP2144086 - Method and device for controlling a parking assistance system for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Laiernstrasse 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffsommer, Klaus Heuchelbergstrasse 21 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2010/02] | Application number, filing date | 08012464.7 | 10.07.2008 | [2010/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2144086 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/93, G01S15/93 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
G01S13/931 (EP);
G01S15/93 (EP);
G01S2013/9314 (EP);
G01S2013/9317 (EP);
G01S2013/932 (EP);
G01S2013/9324 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/37] |
Former [2010/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Parkassistenzsystems für Fahrzeuge | [2010/02] | English: | Method and device for controlling a parking assistance system for vehicles | [2010/02] | French: | Procédé et dispositif destinés à la commande d'un système d'assistance au stationnement pour véhicules | [2010/02] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3813083 (IND TECH RES INST [TW]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, lines 16-43; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0952460 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0011] , [0015] , [0016]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE10012761 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7* column 10, line 60 - column 11, line 11; figures 6-8 *; | [X]DE102006043345 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE102004029038 |