EP1980275 - Fistula graft with deformable sheet-form material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Biotech, Inc. 1425 Innovation Place West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [2016/04] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states Cook Biotech, Inc. 1425 Innovation Place West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patel, Umesh, H. 1135 Kingwood Road South West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | 02 /
Obermiller, F. Joseph 1906 Blueberry Lane West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | 03 /
Graham, Matthew R. 6006 Tangle Creek Court Fort Wayne, Indiana 46817 / US | 04 /
Fette, Clay D. 12335 Acapulco Avenue Palm Beach Gardens, Florida 33410 / US | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2008/42] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 08012521.4 | 28.04.2006 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | US20050676482P | 29.04.2005 Original published format: US 676482 P | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1980275 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1980275 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1980275 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36, A61K35/22, A61K35/38, A61B17/00, A61L31/00 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
A61L27/3604 (EP,US);
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61K35/22 (EP,US);
A61K35/38 (EP,US);
A61L31/005 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00641 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/42] | A61L27/36, A61K35/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fisteltransplantat mit verformbaren flächenförmigem Material | [2008/42] | English: | Fistula graft with deformable sheet-form material | [2008/42] | French: | Greffe de fistule avec matériau en forme de feuille déformable | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 13.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.12.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06813183.8 / EP1874365 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060813183) is 29.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2006 | AT | 27.01.2016 | BE | 27.01.2016 | CY | 27.01.2016 | CZ | 27.01.2016 | DK | 27.01.2016 | EE | 27.01.2016 | ES | 27.01.2016 | FI | 27.01.2016 | IT | 27.01.2016 | LT | 27.01.2016 | LV | 27.01.2016 | MC | 27.01.2016 | NL | 27.01.2016 | PL | 27.01.2016 | RO | 27.01.2016 | SE | 27.01.2016 | SI | 27.01.2016 | SK | 27.01.2016 | TR | 27.01.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | GR | 28.04.2016 | IE | 28.04.2016 | LU | 28.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | IS | 27.05.2016 | PT | 27.05.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.04.2006 | |
AT | 27.01.2016 | ||
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IE | 28.04.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IE | 28.04.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
LU | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 27.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03009764 (WILSON COOK MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12,16,18,19 * claims 1-12 *; | [XP]US2005159776 (ARMSTRONG DAVID N [US]) [XP] 1,3-8,11,12,16,17,19 * claims; paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0049] * | [XI] - MALUF-FILHO F ET AL, "Endoscopic Treatment of Esophagogastric Fistulae with an Acellular Matrix", GASTROINTESTINAL ENDOSCOPY, ELSEVIER, NL, (200404), vol. 59, no. 5, ISSN 0016-5107, page P151, XP004854594 [X] 1,3,5-8,17 * abstract * [I] 13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5107(04)00722-9 | Examination | WO2005070302 | by applicant | US4902508 | US5554389 | US5993844 | US6206931 | US6099567 | - C. HEESCHEN ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2001), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 833 - 839 | - C. JOHNSON ET AL., CIRCULATION RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 94, no. 2, pages 262 - 268 |