EP2016905 - Ultrasound diagnostic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Aloka Medical, Ltd. 6-22-1, Mure Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8622 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Hitachi Aloka Medical, Ltd. 6-22-1, Mure, Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8622 / JP | ||
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Aloka Co., Ltd. 6-22-1 Mure Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8622 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murashita, Masaru c/o Hitachi Aloka Medical, Ltd 6-22-1, Mure Mitaka-shi Tokyo, 181-8622 / JP | [2012/10] |
Former [2009/04] | 01 /
Murashita, Masaru Aloka Co., Ltd. 6-22-1, Mure Mitaka-shi Tokyo, 181-8622 / JP | Representative(s) | Heim, Hans-Karl, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Heim, Hans-Karl, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012536.2 | 10.07.2008 | [2009/04] | Priority number, date | JP20070185565 | 17.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007185565 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2016905 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2016905 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2016905 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T7/20, A61B8/06 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
A61B8/06 (EP,US);
A61B8/13 (EP,US);
A61B8/483 (EP,US);
G06T7/215 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10136 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/04] | A61B8/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/24] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Diagnostische Ultraschallvorrichtung | [2009/04] | English: | Ultrasound diagnostic apparatus | [2009/04] | French: | Appareil de diagnostic ultrasonore | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 07.04.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.05.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6352509 (KAWAGISHI TETSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 10 - column 8, line 4; figures 1,8,9,10,22 *; | [Y]EP1189074 (GE MED SYS GLOBAL TECH CO LLC [US]) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0036] - [0038] *; | [Y]US6423006 (BANJANIN ZORAN [US]) [Y] 16 * paragraphs [0003] , [0022]; figures 1A,3 *; | [XY]US6503202 (HOSSACK JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10,11,15,17 * column 2, line 66 - column 8, line 45; figures 1,3,4 * * column 10, line 17 - line 21 * * column 12, line 35 - column 14, line 10 * [Y] 8,9,12,13,16; | [A]WO2006086442 (UNIV CASE WESTERN RESERVE [US], et al) [A] 5 * paragraphs [0044] , [0047] , [0109] *; | [Y] - BULLITT E ET AL, "Volume Rendering of Segmented Tubular Objects", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER, DE, (20010101), vol. 2208, ISSN 0302-9743, pages 161 - 168, XP002579462 [Y] 12,13 * page 162, line 18 - page 166, line 5 * * page 344, column left, line 55 - column right, line 36 * * page 348, column right, line 31 - page 349, column left, line 9 * * page 349, column right, line 40 - line 42 * | [A] - MCINERNEY T ET AL, "Deformable models in medical image analysis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE WORKSHOP ON MATHEMATICAL METHODS INBIOMEDICAL IMAGE ANALYSIS, XX, XX, (19950621), pages 171 - 180, XP001179897 [A] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [03.1] , [03.3] , [03.4] * | [A] - MROZ L ET AL, "Maximum intensity projection at warp speed", COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS, ELSEVIER, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0097-8493(00)00030-3, (20000601), vol. 24, no. 3, ISSN 0097-8493, pages 343 - 352, XP004201697 [A] 12,13 * abstract * * page 344, column left, line 55 - column right, line 36 * * page 348, column right, line 31 - page 349, column left, line 9 * * page 349, column right, line 40 - line 42 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0097-8493(00)00030-3 | Examination | EP1152364 | by applicant | JP2001017428 | JP2005040622 | JP2005157664 | JP2006051202 |