EP2015504 - Transmission of a CCFI or of PCFICH in a wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/03] | Transmit methods for CCFI/PCFICH in a wireless communication system | ||
[2009/04] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Joon-Young c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 02 /
Khan, Farooq c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 03 /
Zhang, Jianzhong c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 04 /
Pi, Zhouyue c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012611.3 | 11.07.2008 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | US20070929791P | 12.07.2007 Original published format: US 929791 P | US20070929869P | 16.07.2007 Original published format: US 929869 P | US20080213012 | 12.06.2008 Original published format: US 213012 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2015504 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2015504 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L1/00 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
H04L1/0041 (EP);
H04L1/0057 (EP);
H04L1/0072 (EP);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L1/0625 (EP);
H04L5/0091 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Übertragung von CCFI oder PCFICH in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem | [2009/04] | English: | Transmission of a CCFI or of PCFICH in a wireless communication system | [2009/04] | French: | Transmission de CCFI ou de PCFICH dans un système de communication sans fil | [2009/04] |
Former [2009/03] | Übertragungsverfahren für CCFI/PCFICH in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem | ||
Former [2009/03] | Transmit methods for CCFI/PCFICH in a wireless communication system | ||
Former [2009/03] | Procédés de transmission pour ccfi/pcfich dans un système de communication sans fil | Examination procedure | 11.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 05.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/02] | 07.11.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/02] | Appeal following examination | 06.10.2015 | Appeal received No. T0195/16 | 07.12.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.11.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 07.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.11.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2008140221 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]; ROH DONG WOOK [KR]; KIM BONG HOE [KR]; YUN YO) [E] 1-6,8,12 * page 7, line 12 - line 21 * * page 31 *; | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "Cat0 Transmission Structure", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-072601 CAT0, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070514), vol. RAN WG1, no. Kobe, Japan; 20070514, XP050106298 [Y] 1-12 * page 1 * | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "Coding for CCFI Transmission", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-073098 CCFI CODING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070620), vol. RAN WG1, no. Orlando, USA; 20070620, XP050106750 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "On the design of PCFICH coding", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-072881, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070620), vol. RAN WG1, no. Orlando, USA; 20070620, XP050106560 [A] 1-12 * page 1 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Summary of e-mail discussion on downlink control signaling", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-073051, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070702), vol. RAN WG1, no. Orlando, USA; 20070702, XP050106709 [A] 1-12 * section 2.2 * * introduction * |