EP2028385 - Coupling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2012/11] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krebs, Florian Lange Strasse 58 76530 Baden-Baden / DE | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/13] | Application number, filing date | 08012665.9 | 14.07.2008 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | DE20071039299 | 20.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007039299 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2028385 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2028385 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2028385 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/13] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2028385 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/75 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
F16D21/06 (EP);
F16D13/757 (EP);
F16D2021/0615 (EP);
F16D2021/0684 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | Kupplungsaggregat | [2009/09] | English: | Coupling device | [2009/09] | French: | Embrayage | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 01.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2008 | CY | 28.03.2012 | CZ | 28.03.2012 | DK | 28.03.2012 | EE | 28.03.2012 | FI | 28.03.2012 | HR | 28.03.2012 | IT | 28.03.2012 | LT | 28.03.2012 | LV | 28.03.2012 | MT | 28.03.2012 | NL | 28.03.2012 | PL | 28.03.2012 | RO | 28.03.2012 | SE | 28.03.2012 | SI | 28.03.2012 | SK | 28.03.2012 | TR | 28.03.2012 | BG | 28.06.2012 | NO | 28.06.2012 | GR | 29.06.2012 | ES | 09.07.2012 | GB | 14.07.2012 | IE | 14.07.2012 | LU | 14.07.2012 | IS | 28.07.2012 | PT | 30.07.2012 | BE | 31.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
GB | 14.07.2012 | ||
IE | 14.07.2012 | ||
LU | 14.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
GB | 14.07.2012 | ||
IE | 14.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
GB | 14.07.2012 | ||
IE | 14.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
GB | 14.07.2012 | ||
IE | 14.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
GB | 14.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
GB | 14.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
GB | 14.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 28.03.2012 | |
NO | 28.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19743782 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 2 *; | [XI]DE10048555 (ZF SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1,6-8,10 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] - [0036] - [0038] * [I] 2-4; | [A]US2002074203 (BLESSINGER JEFFREY S [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 2-5 ** paragraph [0021] * | by applicant | DE4239291 | DE4239289 | DE4431641 | DE4322667 | DE19905373 | EP0992700 | EP1452760 | DE10340665 | DE102005037514 | WO2007000131 | WO2007000140 | WO2007000151 | WO2007062618 |