EP2017540 - Air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [2009/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekine, Takashi 815-2-201, Uchigashima-cho Ota-shi Gunma 373-0813 / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Kenji 46-7. Nittamizuki-cho Ota-shi Gunma 370-0311 / JP | 03 /
Sakamoto, Naoki 2771-4, Nakano Ora-machi Ora-gun Gunma 370-0603 / JP | [2011/19] |
Former [2009/04] | 01 /
Sekine, Takashi 815-2-201, Uchigashima-cho Ota-shi Gumma 373-0813 / JP | ||
02 /
Kobayashi, Kenji 46-7. Nittamizuki-cho Ota-shi Gumma 370-0311 / JP | |||
03 /
Sakamoto, Naoki 2771-4, Nakano Ora-machi Ora-gun Gumma 370-0603 / JP | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/04] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012851.5 | 16.07.2008 | [2009/04] | Priority number, date | JP20070185224 | 17.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007185224 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2017540 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2017540 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00, F25B13/00, F25B27/02 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/873 (EP,KR,US);
F25B13/00 (KR);
F25B29/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, HU, IT [2009/39] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klimaanlage | [2009/04] | English: | Air conditioner | [2009/04] | French: | Climatiseur | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2011 | [2013/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02279962 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-7* abstract *; | [X]EP1275913 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1521046 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1607696 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1607695 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1617158 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1775528 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH02279962 |