EP1980315 - Apparatus and method for dispensing a use solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/42] | Solid product dispenser and method and apparatus to control dispensing rate of a solid product with changing temperature | ||
[2010/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul, MN 55102-2233 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul MN 55102-2233 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, John E. 1019 East Hazel Street River Falls WI 54022 / US | 02 /
Plantikow, Robert J 116, E.Hamblett St. Orfordville WI 53576-9406 / US | 03 /
Berg, Thomas P. 4607 Hanberry Drive Greensboro NC 27410 / US | 04 /
Batcher, Thomas 1948 Crown Point Drive Mendota Heights MN 55118 / US | 05 /
Brady, Daniel F. 3996 Braddock Road High Point NC 27265 / US | 06 /
Russell, Scott T. 3138 Meadowbrook Drive Woodbury MN 55125 / US | 07 /
Everson, Terrence P. 560 Country Court Eagan MN 55123 / US | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2008/42] | Polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | Application number, filing date | 08013057.8 | 14.10.2005 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | US20040619783P | 18.10.2004 Original published format: US 619783 P | US20040619727P | 18.10.2004 Original published format: US 619727 P | US20050152917 | 15.06.2005 Original published format: US 152917 | US20050152940 | 15.06.2005 Original published format: US 152940 | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1980315 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1980315 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1980315 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01F1/00, // A47L15/44 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
B01F21/4021 (EP);
B01F21/221 (EP);
B01F35/2115 (EP);
B01F35/2211 (EP);
B01F35/718051 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ausgabe einer Flüssigkeit | [2010/31] | English: | Apparatus and method for dispensing a use solution | [2010/31] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la distribution d'une solution | [2010/31] |
Former [2008/42] | Festkörperautomat und Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Ausgaberate eines Festkörperprodukt mit sich ändernder Temperatur | ||
Former [2008/42] | Solid product dispenser and method and apparatus to control dispensing rate of a solid product with changing temperature | ||
Former [2008/42] | Distributeur de produit solide et procédé et appareil pour contrôler la vitesse de distribution d'un produit solide avec une température changeante | Examination procedure | 19.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 23.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05808958.2 / EP1814649 | Divisional application(s) | EP10160228.2 / EP2216089 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.2011 | CY | 30.03.2011 | CZ | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | EE | 30.03.2011 | FI | 30.03.2011 | LT | 30.03.2011 | LV | 30.03.2011 | NL | 30.03.2011 | RO | 30.03.2011 | SI | 30.03.2011 | SK | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | BG | 30.06.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | IS | 30.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | IE | 14.10.2011 | LU | 14.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 14.10.2011 | ||
LU | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 14.10.2011 | ||
LU | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 14.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 30.03.2011 | |
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4569781 (FERNHOLZ PETER J [GB], et al) [A] 10-15* abstract *; | [XA]US5607651 (THOMAS JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,8,9 * column 4, line 25 - column 7, line 24; figures 2,3 * [A] 2,10-15; | [A]US5782109 (SPRIGGS JOHN ROSS [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 21 - column 2, line 34; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 1 - column 5, line 27 *; | [A]US5846499 (LAUGHLIN TIMOTHY E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6240953 (LAUGHLIN TIMOTHY E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 9 - column 3, line 65; figures 1,2,8 *; | [A]US6737028 (SCEPANSKI WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2004124263 (SEEMAN GEORGE [US]) [A] 10-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US4826661 |