EP2065495 - Multiple yarn interlacing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMT Machinery, Inc. 6th Fl., Osaka Green Bldg. 2-6-26 Kitahama Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasagawa, Takefumi c/o TMT Machinery Inc Kyoto Technical Center 136, Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Kinzo c/o TMT Machinery Inc Kyoto Technical Center 136, Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08013762.3 | 31.07.2008 | [2009/23] | Priority number, date | JP20070308383 | 29.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007308383 | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2065495 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2065495 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D02J1/08, D02G1/16 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
D02J1/08 (EP);
D02G1/161 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | D02J1/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verwirbelung von Mehrfachgarnen | [2009/23] | English: | Multiple yarn interlacing device | [2009/23] | French: | Dispositif d'entrelacement de fils multiples | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3659350 (MCCULLOUGH JAMES D) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-4 * [Y] 7-8 [I] 7-8; | [X]US4644622 (BAUER KARL [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 4a,4b *; | [X]US3324526 (THOMAS BURNS JOHN, et al) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US3261071 (CLENDENING JR FRANCIS JOSEPH, et al) [X] 1-6 * figures 3-5 * [I] 7,9; | [X]US6052878 (ALLRED KEVIN LYLE [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * figures 1,3a-3f *; | [A]WO8902942 (SCHWEIZERISCHE VISCOSE [CH]) [A] 1-9 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE19947894 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [A] 1-9 * figures 6,8 *; | [A]US4070815 (NEGISHI TAKAO, et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 19-22 *; | [Y]US3822449 (DICK B) [Y] 7-8 * figure 1 *; | [E]DE102008018970 (OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [E] 1-6 * figures 3-6 *; | [E]DE102008008516 (OERLIKON HEBERLEIN TEMCO WATTW [CH]) [E] 1-8 * figures 1-10 * | by applicant | JPH09250043 |