EP1988406 - Data boundary aware base station assisted position location method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Inyup 4257 Calle Isabelino San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
Zou, Quizhen 5791 Rutgers Road La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 03 /
Sih, Gilbert C. 7804 Pipit Place San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08013899.3 | 03.09.1999 | [2008/45] | Priority number, date | US19980150410 | 09.09.1998 Original published format: US 150410 | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1988406 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1988406 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/00 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
G01S5/0036 (EP,US);
G01S19/30 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/246 (EP);
G01S19/254 (EP,US);
G01S19/258 (EP,US);
G01S19/235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Positionsbestimmung mit Hilfe einer Basis-Station, die die Daten - Begrenzungen kennt | [2008/45] | English: | Data boundary aware base station assisted position location method | [2008/45] | French: | Procede de localisation de position assistee par station de base inegrant la limite des donnees | [2008/45] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99949596.3 / EP1118015 | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | BE | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | IE | 03.09.2011 | LU | 03.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/35] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
IE | 03.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5365450 (SCHUCHMAN LEONARD [US], et al) [A] 1-4* column 4, line 8 - column 7, line 60; figures 2,4,5 *; | [A]WO9733382 (SNAPTRACK INC [US], et al) [A] 6,7,14,15 * abstract *; | [A] - LI J ET AL, "Coherent serial acquisition schemes for PN sequences with data modulation", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1992. MILCOM '92, CONFERENCE RECOR D. COMMUNICATIONS - FUSING COMMAND, CONTROL AND INTELLIGENCE., IEEE SAN DIEGO, CA, USA 11-14 OCT. 1992, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19921011), ISBN 978-0-7803-0585-4, pages 623 - 627, XP010060866 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.1992.244003 | [A] - LI J ET AL, "OPTIMAL AND SUBOPTIMAL COHERENT ACQUISITION SCHEMES FOR PN SEQUENCES WITH DATA MODULATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19950201), vol. 43, no. 2/04, PART 01, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 554 - 564, XP000506559 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.403758 | [A] - CHENG U ET AL, "Spread-spectrum code acquisition in the presence of Doppler shift and data modulation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19900201), vol. 38, no. 2, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 241 - 250, XP002159275 [A] 1-16 * Section IIII; page 245 - page 248 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.47859 | by applicant | US6081229 |