EP2031529 - Medical apparatus and medical system provided with the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozaki, Takashi c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
Ozaki, Takashi c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08014219.3 | 08.08.2008 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | JP20070210002 | 10.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007210002 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2031529 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2031529 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
G16H30/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/46] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Medizinische Vorrichtung und medizinisches System damit | [2009/10] | English: | Medical apparatus and medical system provided with the same | [2009/10] | French: | Appareil médical et système médical doté de celui-ci | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 04.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6351547 (JOHNSON CHANDLER A [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 20 - line 56 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 13 ** abstract *; | [X]US2004141661 (HANNA CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0031] , [0052] , [0059] , [0136] - [0139] * | Examination | US4827908 | US6859288 | by applicant | US6351547 | US2004141661 |