EP2014208 - Refill container with RFID for liquid dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kanfer, Joseph S. 4445 Everett Road Richfield Ohio 44286 / US | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reynolds, Aaron R. 106 Cherry Drive N.W. Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | 02 /
Rosenkranz, Mark E. 6810 Dartworth Drive Parma, Ohio 44129 / US | 03 /
Waterhouse, Paul 151 Carlingview Court Unit 3 Etobicoke, Ontario M9W 5S4 / CA | [2012/48] |
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
Reynolds, Aaron R. 106 Cherry Drive N.W. Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | ||
02 /
Rosenkranz, Mark E. 6810 Dartworth Drive Parma, Ohio 44129 / US | |||
03 /
Waterhouse, Paul 151 Carlingview Court, Unit 3 Etobicoke, Ontario M9W 5S4 / CA | Representative(s) | Makovski, Priscilla Mary Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2012/48] |
Former [2009/03] | Makovski, Priscilla Mary Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08014279.7 | 09.12.2005 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | US20040013727 | 15.12.2004 Original published format: US 13727 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014208 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014208 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47K5/12 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
B67D7/348 (EP,US);
G07F7/00 (KR);
A47K5/1217 (EP,US);
B41J2/17506 (EP,US);
B41J2/17546 (EP,US);
B67D2001/0811 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Wiederbefüllbarer Behälter mit RFID für einen Flüssigkeitsspender | [2009/03] | English: | Refill container with RFID for liquid dispenser | [2009/03] | French: | Conteneur réutilisable avec RFID pour un distributeur de liquides | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 15.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05257592.5 / EP1671568 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050257592) is 30.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2005 | AT | 28.11.2012 | CY | 28.11.2012 | CZ | 28.11.2012 | EE | 28.11.2012 | FI | 28.11.2012 | IS | 28.11.2012 | LT | 28.11.2012 | LV | 28.11.2012 | PL | 28.11.2012 | RO | 28.11.2012 | SI | 28.11.2012 | SK | 28.11.2012 | TR | 28.11.2012 | LU | 09.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | BG | 28.02.2013 | GR | 01.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 09.12.2005 | |
AT | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LU | 09.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LU | 09.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 28.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5305915 (KAMYSZ RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 12-25; figure . *; | [A]US6036056 (LEE KUO-CHOU [TW], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US2001050116 (SKELL DANIEL G [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0040] - [0042]; figure 16 * | by applicant | US6390329 | US6431400 |