EP2157251 - Bottom insert for a sewer manhole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kessel GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 31 85101 Lenting / DE | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schreyer, Peter Föhrenweg 1 92339 Beilngries / DE | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08014541.0 | 14.08.2008 | [2010/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2157251 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E03F5/02 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
E03F5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/43] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bodeneinsatz für einen Kanalschacht | [2010/08] | English: | Bottom insert for a sewer manhole | [2010/08] | French: | Insert de fond pour un regard d'égout | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/09] | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004007857 (UPONOR INNOVATION AB [SE]; HIPPELAEINEN ESKO [FI]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9114052 (NYSETH INGVALD [NO]; URKE IVAR [NO]) [X] 1,2 * figure 13 *; | [X]NL1000840C (WACO LIESBOSCH BETON B V [NL]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1443052 (HEPWORTH IRON CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * |