EP2009046 - Polymer sheets and methods of controlling adhesion of polymer sheets to glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solutia Inc. 575 Maryville Centre Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63141 / US | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wade, Bruce 37 Bluebird Lane West Springfield, MA 01089 / US | 02 /
D'Errico, John 62 Washington Street Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 03 /
Thompson, Helen 54 Green Tree Lane Somers, CT 06071 / US | 04 /
Yu, Michael 69 Erin Lane Ludlow, MA 01056 / US | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08014550.1 | 08.03.2005 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | US20040801052 | 16.03.2004 Original published format: US 801052 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2009046 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/098, B32B17/10, B32B27/30 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
B32B17/10761 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
B29D7/01 (KR);
B32B17/10688 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/098 (KR);
C08L29/14 (KR);
B29L2007/002 (KR);
C08J2329/14 (KR);
C08L2203/16 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Extension states | YU | 12.01.2009 | Title | German: | Polymerbögen und Verfahren zur Steuerung der Haftung von Polymerbögen auf Glas | [2009/01] | English: | Polymer sheets and methods of controlling adhesion of polymer sheets to glass | [2009/01] | French: | Feuilles de polymère et procédés de contrôle d'adhésion de feuilles de polymère sur du verre | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05724569.8 / EP1745095 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050724569) is 27.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1487497 (MONSANTO CO) [Y] 1-9,20,21* page 5, column 2, lines 14-21; table V *; | [A]EP0373139 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1-9,20,21 * page 4, line 41 - page 5, line 11; example 1; claims 1,8 *; | [Y]WO2004011538 (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,20,21 * example 7; claim 1 * | by applicant | US2282057 | US2282026 | US2496480 | US3271235 | US3841890 | US4144217 | US4654179 | US4814529 | US4874814 | US4902464 | US5013779 | US5137954 | US5728472 | - "Encyclopedia of Polymer Science & Technology", VINYL ACETAL POLYMERS, (2003), vol. 8, pages 381 - 399 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 79992-76-0 | - "Encyclopedia of Polymer Science & Technology", B.E. WADE, Vinyl Acetal Polymers, (2003), vol. 8, pages 381 - 399 |