EP2040067 - Anion concentration measuring device and element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamahori, Masao c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Ishige, Yu c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Yamashita, Kotaro c/o Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation Naka Division 882, Ichige, Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8504 / JP | 04 /
Shibata, Yasuhisa c/o Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation Naka Division 882, Ichige, Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8504 / JP | 05 /
Miyake, Masafumi c/o Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation Naka Division 882, Ichige, Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8504 / JP | 06 /
Nagamine, Kuniaki c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2009/26] |
Former [2009/13] | 01 /
Kamahori, Masao c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Ishige, Yu c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamashita, Kotaro c/o Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation Naka Division 882, Ichige, Hitachinaka-shi Obaraki 312-8504 / JP | |||
04 /
Shibata, Yasuhisa c/o Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation Naka Division 882, Ichige, Hitachinaka-shi Obaraki 312-8504 / JP | |||
05 /
Miyake, Masafumi c/o Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation Naka Division 882, Ichige, Hitachinaka-shi Obaraki 312-8504 / JP | |||
06 /
Nagamine, Kuniaki c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2009/13] | Application number, filing date | 08014646.7 | 18.08.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | JP20070242790 | 19.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007242790 | JP20080149385 | 06.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008149385 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2040067 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2040067 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/333, G01N27/414 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
G01N27/3335 (EP,US);
G01N27/414 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2013/36] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anionkonzentrations-Messvorrichtung und Element | [2009/13] | English: | Anion concentration measuring device and element | [2009/13] | French: | Dispositif et élément de mesure de la concentration d'anions | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 02.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.08.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 31.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0300364 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,3,9,10* page 3, line 26 - page 7, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]JPH03259739 (TAIYO YUDEN KK) [Y] 1-3,7-10,14,15 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 2 - column 11, paragraph 4; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP1619496 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] - [0042]; figures 1-3,7-9,12-15,19 *; | [Y] - KNOLL W ET AL, "Supramolecular engineering at functionalized surfaces", SYNTHETIC METALS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 61, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/0379-6779(93)91193-6, ISSN 0379-6779, (19931123), pages 5 - 11, (19931123), XP023787715 [Y] 4-6,11-13 * page 8, column 2, paragraphs 1-2; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0379-6779(93)91193-6 | [Y] - FLINK S ET AL, "SENSOR FUNCTIONALITIES IN SELF-ASSEMBLED MONOLAYERS", ADVANCED MATERIALS, WILEY VCH VERLAG, DE, (20000915), vol. 12, no. 18, doi:10.1002/1521-4095(200009)12:18<1315::AID-ADMA1315>3.3.CO;2-B, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 1315 - 1328, XP000959967 [Y] 4-6,11-13 * page 1319, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 1323, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4095(200009)12:18<1315::AID-ADMA1315>3.3.CO;2-B | [Y] - NANTANIT WANICHACHEVA ET AL, "Surface-Based Lithium Ion Sensor: An Electrode Derivatized with a Self-Assembled Monolayer", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20061001), vol. 78, no. 20, doi:10.1021/ac0603429, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 7132 - 7137, XP055044629 [Y] 1,3,9,10 * page 7132, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 7133, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 7135, column 1, paragraph 7 - column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac0603429 | by applicant | JP2004184365 | WO2006113440 | JP2007242790 | JP2008149385 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1998), vol. 120, pages 4652 - 4657 | - ANAL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 78, pages 7132 - 7137 | - LANGMUIR, (2006), vol. 22, pages 10732 - 10738 |