EP2037484 - Semiconductor processing part having apertures with deposited coatings and a method for forming the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/12] | Semiconductor processing parts having apertures with deposited coatings and methods for forming the same | ||
[2010/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASM INTERNATIONAL N.V. Jan van Eycklaan 10 3723 BC Bilthoven / NL | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuznetsov, Vladimir Birstumerraklaan 11 3444 TA Utrecht / NL | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | polypatent Patentanwälte An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Polypatent Postfach 11 07 51482 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Polypatent Postfach 11 07 51482 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 08014738.2 | 20.08.2008 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | US20070856418 | 17.09.2007 Original published format: US 856418 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2037484 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2037484 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2037484 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, B01J4/00 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
C30B23/005 (EP,US);
C23C16/045 (EP,US);
C23C16/4404 (EP,US);
C23C16/45565 (EP,US);
C30B35/002 (EP,US);
H01L21/67103 (EP,US);
H01L21/67109 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2010/04] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterverarbeitungsteil mit Öffnungen mit einer aufgetragenen Beschichtung und ein Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2010/21] | English: | Semiconductor processing part having apertures with deposited coatings and a method for forming the same | [2010/21] | French: | Pièce de traitement à semi-conducteur disposant d'ouvertures avec des revêtements déposés et son procédé de formation | [2010/21] |
Former [2009/12] | Halbleiterverarbeitungsteile mit Öffnungen mit aufgetragener Beschichtung und Bildungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2009/12] | Semiconductor processing parts having apertures with deposited coatings and methods for forming the same | ||
Former [2009/12] | Pièces de traitement à semi-conducteur disposant d'ouvertures avec des revêtements déposés et leurs procédés de formation | Examination procedure | 11.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 21.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005294559 (JAPAN ADV INST SCIENCE & TECH) [A] 1-7,13-23 * abstract *; | [A]US2005178748 (BUCHBERGER DOUGLAS A JR [US], et al) [A] 1-7,13-23 * paragraphs [0152] , [0153] , [0167] - paragraph [0170]; figures 12,19,20 * | by applicant | JP2005294559 | US2005178748 |