EP2123258 - Liposomes for drug delivery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liplasome Pharma A/S Bygning 207, DTU Anker Engelundsvej 1 2800 Lyngby / DK | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vikbjerg, Anders Falk Vesthegnet 52 2670 Greve / DK | 02 /
Petersen, Sune Allan Magevej 74, 3tv 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | 03 /
Melander, Fredrik Kristianstadgatan 35 A 21435 Malmö / SE | 04 /
Henriksen, Jonas Rosager Gravenstensvej 14 3450 Allerod / DK | 05 /
Jorgensen, Kent Bagsvaerd Hovedgade 99, 12H 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Christensen, Bent, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Christensen, Bent, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 08014793.7 | 20.08.2008 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | DK20080000717 | 23.05.2008 Original published format: DK 200800717 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123258 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K33/24, A61K31/282 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
A61K9/1271 (EP,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/203 (EP,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/475 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K38/14 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] |
Former [2010/30] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Liposomen zur Arzneimittelverabreichung | [2009/48] | English: | Liposomes for drug delivery | [2009/48] | French: | Liposomes pour l'administration de médicaments | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/52] | 31.12.2099 | Examination requested [2010/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9011781 (ALCON LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8,11-32 * page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 8; example 1 * * page 11; example 2 * * page 12 - page 13; example 3 * * claims 1-28 *; | [X]WO9738010 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA], et al) [X] 1-11,13-22,28-30 * page 37, line 5 - page 39, line 3 * * page 40, lines 5-23 * * page 58, lines 18-27 * * page 66, lines 27-32 *; | [X]US2003054027 (UNGER EVAN C [US]) [X] 1-11,13-17,20-22 * page 2, paragraphs 15-17 * * page 6, paragraphs 55,58 * * page 48; examples 1,2 * * page 49; example 6 *; | [X]WO2004087105 (CELATOR TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11,13-22,28-30 * page 4, paragraph 10 * * page 6, paragraphs 23,24 * * page 7, paragraphs 26,28-32 * * page 8, paragraphs 33,36 * * page 8, paragraph 38 - page 9, paragraph 41 * * page 20, paragraph 85 * * page 24, paragraph 99 * * page 27 - page 34; examples 2-6 *; | [X]US2004203069 (REUTELINGSPERGER CHRIS [NL]) [X] 1-4,8,11,13-17,20-22,28-30 * page 3, paragraph 24 * * page 4; example 2 *; | [X]WO2007028020 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 28-32 * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph L * * page 14, paragraph 6 * * page 17 - page 18; examples 1-4 *; | [X]WO2007123691 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 28-32 * page 5, lines 27-32 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 7 *; | [A]US2008069778 (PARGAONKAR NIKHIL [US]) [A] 1-32 * page 2, paragraph 44 ** page 3; example 1 *; | [X] - STEFFAN G ET AL, "DIVALENT CATION-DEPENDENT INTERACTION OF SULFATED POLYSACCHARIDES WITH PHOSPHATIDYLCHOLINE AND MIXED PHOSPHATIDYLCHOLINE/PHOSPHATIDYLGLYCEROL LIPOSOMES", CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS OF LIPIDS, LIMERICK, IR, (19940101), vol. 74, no. 2, ISSN 0009-3084, pages 141 - 150, XP002054990 [X] 1-3,8-17,22-32 * abstract * * page 142, column R, paragraph L - page 143, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 145, column R, paragraph L - page 146, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 146; figure 6 * * page 148, column R, paragraph L - page 149, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-3084(94)90055-8 | [X] - CHIU G N C ET AL, "Selective protein interactions with phosphatidylserine containing liposomes alter the steric stabilization properties of poly(ethylene glycol)", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. BIOMEMBRANES, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010209), vol. 1510, no. 1-2, ISSN 0005-2736, pages 56 - 69, XP004248767 [X] 28-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0005-2736(00)00335-7 | by applicant | EP1254143 | WO2006048017 |