EP2031472 - Device for operating a machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bund, Gerhard Talstrasse 102 97816 Lohr-Rodenbach / DE | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Schuhbießer, Irmgard Gertrud, et al Schuhbießer-Patent Holzgartenstraße 6 93059 Regensburg / DE | [2020/19] |
Former [2012/48] | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG Intellectual Property Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | ||
Former [2009/10] | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG Intellectual Property Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 08014835.6 | 21.08.2008 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | DE20071041364 | 30.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007041364 | DE20071049162 | 13.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007049162 | [2009/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2031472 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2031472 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2031472 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/48] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2031472 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/414, B25J9/16 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
G05B19/414 (EP);
B25J9/1602 (EP);
G05B2219/34422 (EP);
G05B2219/34434 (EP);
G05B2219/50218 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | G05B19/414 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/19] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Betrieb einer Maschine | [2009/10] | English: | Device for operating a machine | [2009/10] | French: | Dispositif de fonctionnement d'une machine | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 29.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2013
30.08.2013
ADMISSIBLE FESTO AG & Co. KG Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Partnerschaft mbB Plochinger Straße 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2015/11] |
Former [2013/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2013
FESTO AG & Co. KG Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE Opponent's representative Kocher, Mark Werner Magenbauer & Kollegen Patentanwälte Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | 04.10.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.04.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.04.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.04.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.01.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 30.03.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 29.06.2015 | Appeal received No. T1339/15 | 31.07.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.01.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.08.2008 | CY | 28.11.2012 | CZ | 28.11.2012 | DK | 28.11.2012 | EE | 28.11.2012 | FI | 28.11.2012 | HR | 28.11.2012 | IS | 28.11.2012 | IT | 28.11.2012 | LT | 28.11.2012 | LV | 28.11.2012 | MC | 28.11.2012 | MT | 28.11.2012 | NL | 28.11.2012 | PL | 28.11.2012 | RO | 28.11.2012 | SI | 28.11.2012 | SK | 28.11.2012 | TR | 28.11.2012 | BG | 28.02.2013 | NO | 28.02.2013 | GR | 01.03.2013 | ES | 11.03.2013 | PT | 28.03.2013 | AT | 21.08.2013 | GB | 21.08.2013 | IE | 21.08.2013 | LU | 21.08.2013 | BE | 31.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | FR | 02.09.2013 | SE | 22.08.2019 | [2020/23] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.08.2008 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IS | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
GB | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.08.2013 | ||
LU | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 21.08.2008 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
GB | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.08.2013 | ||
LU | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
GB | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
GB | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
GB | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
GB | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
IE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 28.11.2012 | |
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 28.11.2012 | |
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 28.11.2012 | |
NO | 28.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03081355 (QEM S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 1, line 7 - line 8; figure 2 * * page 2, line 21 - line 24 * * page 6, line 10 - line 20 * * page 10, line 10 - line 20 *; | [X]EP1720083 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] - paragraph [0030] *; | [X]US5493194 (DAMIANO MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 1, line 6 - line 18 * * column 2, line 33 - line 36 * * column 4, line 1 - line 45 *; | [X]DE10145517 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-18 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0026] * | by applicant | WO03081355 | EP1720083 | DE19723956 | Opposition | EP1832398 | DE10357824 | EP1793292 | US4510565 |