EP1997365 - Pin apparatuses and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/46] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osborne, Christopher M. c/o Legal Department Honda R & D Americas, Inc. 21001 State Route 739 Raymond, OH 43067 / US | 02 /
Prinzo, Vincent c/o Legal Department Honda R & D Americas, Inc. 21001 State Route 739 Raymond, OH 43067 / US | [2010/46] |
Former [2008/49] | 01 /
Osborne, Christopher M. c/o Legal Dep.Honda R&D Americas, Inc. 21001 State Route 739 Raymond, OH 43067 / US | ||
02 /
Prinzo, Vincent c/o Legal Dep.Honda R&D Americas, Inc. 21001 State Route 739 Raymond, OH 43067 / US | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08015045.1 | 14.09.2006 | [2008/49] | Priority number, date | US20050228594 | 16.09.2005 Original published format: US 228594 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1997365 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1997365 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/82 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
A01D34/824 (EP,US);
A01D2101/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4984 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49947 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Title | German: | Stiftvorrichtungen und -methoden | [2008/49] | English: | Pin apparatuses and methods | [2008/49] | French: | Appareils de broche et procédés | [2008/49] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06019284.6 / EP1763986 | Divisional application(s) | EP10182830.9 / EP2298060 | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.11.2010 | BE | 17.11.2010 | CY | 17.11.2010 | CZ | 17.11.2010 | DK | 17.11.2010 | EE | 17.11.2010 | FI | 17.11.2010 | HU | 17.11.2010 | LT | 17.11.2010 | LV | 17.11.2010 | NL | 17.11.2010 | PL | 17.11.2010 | RO | 17.11.2010 | SE | 17.11.2010 | SI | 17.11.2010 | SK | 17.11.2010 | TR | 17.11.2010 | BG | 17.02.2011 | GR | 18.02.2011 | ES | 28.02.2011 | IS | 17.03.2011 | PT | 17.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
TR | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB533486 (JAN SIGMUND, et al) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 55 - page 1, line 106; figures 1-4 *; | [DA]US3702016 (KEESEE ERNEST W) [DA] 1-6* column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 39; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2765545 (LEGENDRE DOMINIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 22 - page 6, line 12; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2004181910 (KUO CHUNG-HSIEN [TW]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US3649997 | US3694855 | US3702016 | US3816873 | US4243342 | US6546596 |