EP1997893 - Compositions containing an OX-40 receptor binding agent or a nucleic acid encoding the same and methods for enhancing antigen-specific immune response [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sisters of Providence in Oregon Providence Portland Medical Center, 4805 N.E. Glisan Street Portland, OR 97213 / US | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weinberg, Andrew D. 3266 S.W. Fairmount Boulevard Portland OR 97201 / US | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 08015510.4 | 23.02.1999 | [2008/49] | Priority number, date | US19980028716 | 24.02.1998 Original published format: US 28716 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1997893 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, A61K39/395, A61K38/16, A61K48/00 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/70578 (EP);
C07K16/2878 (EP);
A61K2039/5152 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/49] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen mit OX-40-Rezeptor-bindenen Mitteln oder diese codierende Nukleinsäure und Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Antigen-spezifischen Immunantwort | [2008/49] | English: | Compositions containing an OX-40 receptor binding agent or a nucleic acid encoding the same and methods for enhancing antigen-specific immune response | [2008/49] | French: | Compositions contenant un agent de liaison de récepteur OX-40 ou un acide nucléique l'encodant et procédés d'amélioration d'une réponse immunitaire antigène spécifique | [2008/49] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99909562.3 / EP1060247 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - MORRIS, A. (1) ET AL, "Successful transfection of the Ox - 40 ligand in murine and human tumor cell lines.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, (1997) VOL. 38, NO. 0, PP. 401. MEETING INFO.: EIGHTY-EIGHTH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA APRIL 12-16, 1997 ISSN:, (1997), vol. 38, XP002109413 [X] 14 * the whole document * | [XD] - VETTO J T ET AL, "Presence of the T-cell activation marker OX-40 on tumor infiltrating lymphocytes and draining lymph node cells from patients with melanoma and head and neck cancers.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF SURGERY, (1997 SEP) 174 (3) 258-65. JOURNAL CODE: 3Z4. ISSN: 0002-9610., United States, (199709), vol. 174, no. 3, XP002109414 [XD] 1-18 * page 263, column 2, line 41 - page 264, column 36 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9610(97)00139-6 | [A] - WEINBERG A D, "Antibodies to OX - 40 (CD134) can identify and eliminat autoreactive T cells: implications for human autoimmune disease.", MOLECULAR MEDICINE TODAY, (1998 FEB) 4 (2) 76-83. REF: 37 JOURNAL CODE: CMK. ISSN: 1357-4310., ENGLAND: United Kingdom, (199802), vol. 4, no. 2, XP002109415 [A] 1-15 * page 81, column R - page 82, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1357-4310(97)01181-7 | [PX] - WEINBERG A D ET AL, "OX - 40: life beyond the effector T cell stage.", SEMINARS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1998 DEC) 10 (6) 471-80. REF: 31 JOURNAL CODE: A61. ISSN: 1044-5323., United States, (199812), vol. 10, no. 6, XP002109416 [PX] 1-15 * page 471, column L * * page 477 - page 479, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/smim.1998.0146 | [PX] - MORRIS, A. (1) ET AL, "Breast cancer immunity in mice treated with the OX - 40 ligand.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, (MARCH, 1998) VOL. 39, PP. 531. MEETING INFO.: 89TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, USA MARCH 28-APRIL 1, 1998 AMERICAN, (199803), vol. 39, XP002109417 [PX] 1-15 * the whole document * | [PA] - GRAMAGLIA I ET AL, "Ox - 40 ligand: a potent costimulatory molecule for sustaining primary CD4 T cell responses.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1998 DEC 15) 161 (12) 6510-7. JOURNAL CODE: IFB. ISSN: 0022-1767., United States, (19981215), vol. 161, XP002109418 [PA] 1-15 * page 6510 - page 6511, column L * * page 6514, column R - page 6516 * | by applicant | US4356167 | US4690915 | US4902288 | US4946778 | US5188837 | US5225539 | US5229115 | US5338683 | WO9512673 | WO9521915 | US5455030 | US5457035 | US5494807 | US5530101 | EP0733373 | US5565332 | US5580575 | US5585089 | US5593972 | US5595756 | US5620896 | US5631006 | US5643578 | US5648237 | US5665362 | US5837261 | - CL QUEEN ET AL., "Humanized lmmunoglobulins", PROTEIN DESIGN | - GP WINTER, "Recombinant Altered Antibodies And Methods Of Making Altered Antibodies", MED RES COUNCIL, vol. 5, no. 693, pages 761 - 762 | - CL QUEEN ET AL., ""Polynucleotides Encoding Improved Humanized Immunoglobulins", and "Humanized Immunoglobulins"", PROTEIN DESIGN | - CL QUEEN ET AL., "Humanized Immunoglobulins", PROTEIN DESIGN | - PJ CARTER, EXPRESSION OF FUNCTIONAL ANTIBODY FRAGMENTS | - RC LADNER ET AL., SINGLE POLYPEPTIDE CHAIN BINDING MOLECULES | - RC LADNER ET AL., IMMUNOTHERAPY USING SINGLE CHAIN POLYPEPTIDE BINDING MOLECULES | - BETTER ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1989), vol. 178, pages 476 - 496 | - BETTER; HOROWITZ ET AL., Advances in Gene Technology: The Molecular Biology of Immune Disease & the Immune Response, (1990), vol. 10, page 105 | - CALDERHEAD ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, pages 5261 - 5271 | - DUBEY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, page 45 | - GLOCKSHUBER ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 29, pages 1362 - 1367 | - GODFREY ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1994), vol. 180, pages 757 - 762 | - KAYE; HEDRICK, NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, page 746 | - KRUMMEL ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1996), vol. 183, page 2533 | - LATZA ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 677 - 683 | - LENSCHOW ET AL., ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 14, page 233 | - MALLETT ET AL., EMBO J., (1990), vol. 9, pages 1063 - 1068 | - MIURA ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 11, pages 1313 - 1325 | - PATERSON ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 24, pages 1281 - 1290 | - VANDENBARK ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1985), vol. 135, page 223 | - VETTO ET AL., AM. J. SURG., (1997), vol. 174, pages 258 - 265 | - WALUNAS ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1996), vol. 183, pages 2541 - 2550 | - WEINBERG ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1996), vol. 2, pages 183 - 189 | - WEINBERG ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, pages 4712 - 4721 |