EP2036532 - One pack type dental adhesive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Shofu 11 Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Hisaki c/o K.K. Shofu 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Toshihide c/o K.K. Shofu 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | 03 /
Yamaguchi, Yutaka c/o K.K. Shofu 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | 04 /
Deguchi, Mikito c/o K.K. Shofu 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | [2015/31] |
Former [2009/20] | 01 /
Tanaka, Hisaki c/o K.K. Shofu 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | ||
02 /
Fujii, Toshihide c/o K.K. Shofu 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamaguchi, Yutaka c/o K.K. Shofu 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | |||
04 /
Deguchi, Mikito c/o K.K. Shofu 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | |||
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
Tanaka, Hisaki c/o K.K. Shofu 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | ||
02 /
Fujii, Toshihide c/o K.K. Shofu 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamaguchi, Yutake c/o K.K. Shofu 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | |||
04 /
Deguchi, Mikito c/o K.K. Shofu 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2015/31] |
Former [2009/12] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08015778.7 | 08.09.2008 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | JP20070239651 | 14.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007239651 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2036532 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2036532 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2036532 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/00, A61K6/083, A61K6/093 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
A61K6/896 (EP,US);
A61K6/30 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L83/10 (EP,US);
A61K6/887, C08L33/10 (EP,US);
A61K6/896, C08L83/10 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/12] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | DE [2015/31] |
Former [2011/30] | DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einkomponenten-Dentalhaftzusammensetzung | [2009/12] | English: | One pack type dental adhesive composition | [2009/12] | French: | Composition adhésive dentaire d'un seul tenant | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 25.05.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2000248201 ; | [A]JP2002038105 ; | [I]US4539382 (OMURA IKUO [JP], et al) [I] 3 * column 6, line 1 - line 34 * * column 26 - column 29 * * column 30, line 11 - line 16 * * column 65; example 53 *; | [Y]US5670657 (KOJIMA KATSUNORI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * the whole document *; | [XY]JP2001072936 (KURARAY CO) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 4; | [A]WO03013444 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * claim - *; | [I] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 02, Database accession no. 2001-010763, XP002595653 & JP2000248201 A 20000912 (TOKUYAMA CORP) [I] 1-4 * abstract * * tables 1-2 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 44, Database accession no. 2002-409459, XP002602832 & JP2002038105 A 20020206 (KURARAY CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | Examination | EP2036532 | by applicant | JPS6042222B | JPS62281885 | JPS6351308 | JPH0567146B | JPH07258248 | JPH07277913 | JPH0967546 | JPH09137129 | JP2000248201 | JP2002265312 | JP2006045179 | JP2006045094 |