EP2037128 - Device for connecting and locking two structural panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. Portico Building Marina Street Pieta MSD 08 / MT | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER GbR, Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 08015798.5 | 08.09.2008 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | DE20071043308 | 11.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007043308 | [2009/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2037128 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2037128 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/00, E04F15/02 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
E04F15/02 (EP,US);
F16B5/0056 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0138 (EP,US);
E04F2201/028 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0523 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0552 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Verbindung und Verriegelung zweier Bauplatten | [2009/12] | English: | Device for connecting and locking two structural panels | [2009/12] | French: | Dispositif de raccordement et de verrouillage de deux panneaux de construction | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 22.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.01.2010 | CZ | 06.01.2010 | DK | 06.01.2010 | EE | 06.01.2010 | FI | 06.01.2010 | GR | 06.01.2010 | HR | 06.01.2010 | IE | 06.01.2010 | IT | 06.01.2010 | LT | 06.01.2010 | LV | 06.01.2010 | MT | 06.01.2010 | NL | 06.01.2010 | PT | 06.01.2010 | RO | 06.01.2010 | SE | 06.01.2010 | SI | 06.01.2010 | SK | 06.01.2010 | BG | 06.04.2010 | NO | 06.04.2010 | IS | 06.05.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | LU | 08.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/32] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
HR | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
MT | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PT | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
NO | 06.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 07.07.2010 | ||
LU | 08.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
HR | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
MT | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
NO | 06.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 07.07.2010 | ||
LU | 08.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
HR | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
MT | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
NO | 06.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 07.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
HR | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
MT | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
NO | 06.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
HR | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
NO | 06.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | FI | 06.01.2010 | |
HR | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
NO | 06.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | SI | 06.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP1415056 (AKZENTA PANEELE & PROFILE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032]; figures 5-8 *; | [A]DE102006011887 (AKZENTA PANEELE & PROFILE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0149]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2007089186 (PERGO EUROP AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * page 15; figures 4a,4b * | by applicant | EP1415056 |