EP1997823 - Boronic ester and acid compounds, synthesis and uses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 75 Sydney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adams, Julian 121 Laurel Road Brookline, MA 02146 / US | 02 /
Ma, Yu-Ting 44 Morningside Road Needham, MA 02192 / US | 03 /
Stein, Ross 14 Hawes Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 04 /
Baevsky, Matthew 65 West Street Northborough, MA 01532 / US | 05 /
Grenier, Louis 140 Sargeant Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | 06 /
Plamondon, Louis 65 Hamilton Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | [2009/07] |
Former [2008/49] | 01 /
Adams, Julian 121 Laurel Road Brookline, MA 02146 / US | ||
02 /
Ma, Yu-Ting 44 Morningside Road Needham, MA 02192 / US | |||
03 /
Stein, Ross 14 Hawes Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | |||
04 /
Baevsky, Matthew 8 Saint Peter Street Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US | |||
05 /
Grenier, Louis 140 Sargeant Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | |||
06 /
Plamondon, Louis 65 Hamilton Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | Representative(s) | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08016076.5 | 27.10.1995 | [2008/49] | Priority number, date | US19940330525 | 28.10.1994 Original published format: US 330525 | US19950442581 | 16.05.1995 Original published format: US 442581 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1997823 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02, C07K5/06, A61K38/04, A61K31/69, A61P11/06, A61P19/00, A61P37/00, A61P35/00 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
C07F5/025 (EP,US);
A61K31/535 (KR);
C07K5/0808 (US);
A61K31/185 (KR);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07C229/26 (KR);
C07D295/14 (KR);
C07F5/04 (US);
C07K5/06 (US);
C07K5/06043 (EP,US);
C07K5/06139 (EP,US);
C07K5/06191 (EP,US);
C07K5/0827 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/49] | Title | German: | Boronester und Säureverbindungen, Synthese und Verwendungen | [2008/49] | English: | Boronic ester and acid compounds, synthesis and uses | [2008/49] | French: | Composés d'acide et ester boronique, synthèse et utilisations | [2008/49] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 15.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 30.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03004280.8 / EP1312609 | EP05023462.4 / EP1627880 | EP95939670.6 / EP0788360 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950939670) is 19.04.2001 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0145441 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0315574 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5106948 (KINDER DAVID H [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DPY]WO9524914 (MYOGENICS INC [US]) [DPY] 1-10* the whole document *; | [DPY]WO9525533 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [DPY] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4499082 | US4510130 | US4537773 | WO9113904 | US5106948 | US5169841 | WO9417816 | WO9525533 | - KETTNER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 259, no. 24, pages 15106 - 15114 | - HERSHKO ET AL., A. REV. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 61, pages 761 - 807 | - RECHSTEINER ET AL., A. REV. CELL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 3, pages 1 - 30 | - GOLDBERG, EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 203, pages 9 - 23 | - GOLDBERG ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 357, pages 375 - 379 | - ORLOWSKI, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 29, page 10289 | - RIVETT ET AL., ARCHS. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1989), vol. 218, page 1 | - RIVETT ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, page 12 | - TANAKA ET AL., NEW BIOL., (1992), vol. 4, pages 1 - 11 | - DICK ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, pages 2725 - 2734 | - T ANAKA ET AL., NEW BIOL., (1992), vol. 4, pages 1 - 11 | - MURAKAMI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1986), vol. 83, pages 7588 - 7592 | - LI ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, pages 9709 - 9715 | - AOYAGI ET AL., Proteases and Biological Control, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1975), pages 429 - 454 | - GRILLI ET AL., INTERNATIONAL REVIEW OF CYTOLOGY, (1993), vol. 143, pages 1 - 62 | - GLOTZER ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 349, pages 132 - 138 | - HERSHKO, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, page 376 | - The Peptides, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1981), vol. 3, pages 3 - 88 | - BADALAMENTE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA., (1989), vol. 86, pages 5983 - 5987 | - STAUBLI ET AL., BRAIN RESEARCH, (1988), vol. 444, pages 153 - 158 | - ROCK ET AL., CELL, (1994), vol. 78, page 761 | - YOUNG; MUNRO, FEDERATION PROC., (1978), vol. 37, pages 229 - 2300 | - MILLWARD; BATES, BIOCHEM. J., (1983), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 607 - 615 | - KAYALI, AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1987), vol. 252, pages E621 - E626 | - ODEDRA ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1983), vol. 214, pages 617 - 627 | - KAYALI ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1987), vol. 252, pages E621 - E626 | - WING; GOLDBERG, AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1993), vol. 264, pages E668 - E676 | - SCHEFFNER ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 75, pages 495 - 505 | - DONEHOWER ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 356, pages 215 - 221 | - KASTAN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, pages 6304 - 6311 | - KUERBITZ, PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 7491 - 7495 | - KASTAN, CELL, (1992), vol. 71, pages 587 - 597 | - LANE, NATURE, (1992), vol. 358, pages 15 - 16 | - MALTZMAN, MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1984), vol. 4, page 1689 | - HALL ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1993), vol. 8, pages 203 - 207 | - KASTAN ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 71, pages 587 - 597 | - BEG ET AL., GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, (1993), vol. 7, pages 2064 - 2070 | - NERI ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 67, page 1075 | - SCHMID ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, page 733 | - BOURS ET AL., MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 12, page 685 | - MERCURIO ET AL., DNA CELL BIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 11, page 523 | - FAN ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, pages 395 - 398 | - HERSHKO ET AL., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 61, pages 761 - 807 | - MELLITS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 21, no. 22, pages 5059 - 5066 | - HENKEL ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 365, pages 182 - 185 | - BEG ET AL., MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 3301 - 3310 | - PALOMBELLA ET AL., CELL, (1994), vol. 78, pages 773 - 785 | - PALOMBELLA ET AL., CELL, (1994), vol. 78, page 773 | - FRIEDMANN, CURR. OPINION IMMUNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 1, pages 690 - 693 | - PIGUET ET AL., J EXP. MED, (1991), vol. 173, pages 673 - 679 | - NICKOLOFF ET AL., J INVEST. DERMATOL., (1990), vol. 94, pages 151S - 157S | - KETTNER, C.A.; SHENVI, A.B., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 259, page 15106 | - SHEEHAN, J.C. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1965), vol. 87, page 2492 | - CASTRO, B. ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (1976), vol. 11, page 751 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1989), vol. 30, page 1927 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1957), vol. 189 | - ROCK ET AL., CELL, (1994), vol. 78, pages 761 - 771 | US19940212909 |