EP2166239 - Shaft assembly for transferring torque [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centa-Antriebe Kirschey GmbH Bergische Strasse 7 42781 Haan / DE | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirschey, Gerhard Ittertaler Straße 52 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Ostriga Sonnet Wirths & Vorwerk Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Ostriga Sonnet Wirths & Vorwerk Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2012/19] | Ostriga Sonnet Wirths & Vorwerk Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2012/16] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2010/12] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 08016495.7 | 18.09.2008 | [2010/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2166239 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2166239 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16C3/035, F16C29/04, F16C33/46, F16C33/38, F16D3/06 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
F16C3/035 (EP);
F16C29/041 (EP);
F16C33/306 (EP);
F16C33/38 (EP);
F16C33/46 (EP);
F16D3/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | Wellenanordnung zur Drehmomentübertragung | [2010/12] | English: | Shaft assembly for transferring torque | [2010/12] | French: | Agencement d'arbre destiné à la transmission de couple | [2010/12] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2008 | CY | 18.04.2012 | CZ | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | EE | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | HR | 18.04.2012 | LT | 18.04.2012 | LV | 18.04.2012 | MT | 18.04.2012 | NL | 18.04.2012 | PL | 18.04.2012 | RO | 18.04.2012 | SE | 18.04.2012 | SI | 18.04.2012 | SK | 18.04.2012 | TR | 18.04.2012 | BG | 18.07.2012 | NO | 18.07.2012 | GR | 19.07.2012 | ES | 29.07.2012 | IS | 18.08.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | IE | 18.09.2012 | LU | 18.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
LU | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | |
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 18.04.2012 | |
NO | 18.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE7507730U (FRANKE & HEYDRICH KG) [Y] 1,2,4-9,11-14,16 * page 6, line 1 - page 9, line 24; figures 1-9 * [A] 7; | [Y]US4741723 (ORAIN MICHEL A [FR]) [Y] 1,3-6,8,15,16 * column 3, line 22 - column 5, line 5; figures 1-7 *; | [YA]DE19817290 (SKF LINEARSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5-9,11 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 46; figures 1-4 *[A] 1-3,10,15,16; | [XY]DE20317344U (DURA AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS REICHE [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,8,10-14,16,17 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,4,5,7,9,15; | [XY]US2007021223 (KOSSACK HEIKO [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,6,10-12,15-17 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 2,4,5,7-9; | [YA]WO2008019668 (SHAFT FORM ENGINEERING GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9,11-16 * page 5, line 25 - page 9, line 2; figures 1-3 * [A] 10,17 | by applicant | DE20317344U | DE10233758 | DE102004039642 | US2007021223 |