EP2045371 - Method and apparatus for manufacturing an ultra low defect semiconductor single crystalline ingot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siltron Inc. 274, Imsoo-Dong Gumi-city, Gyeonsangbuk-Do 730-724 / KR | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hong, Young-Ho A-408, Bangbae Acro Tower 923-6 Bangbae 1-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-843 / KR | 02 /
Cho, Hyon-Jong 204-1203, Sinnari 2-cha Apt., Okgye-dong, Gumi-si Gyeonbuk 730-380 / KR | 03 /
Lee, Sung-Young Ga-501, Saetbyeol Apt. 39, Songjeong-dong, Gumi-si Gyeongbuk 730-913 / KR | 04 /
Shin, Seung-Ho 48-38 bunji, Singli-2dong, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-838 / KR | 05 /
Lee, Hong-Woo 201-403, Greenvill Apt. 220, Doryang-dong, Gumi-si Gyeongbuk 730-020 / KR | [2012/50] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
Hong, Young-Ho A-408, Bangbae Acro Tower 923-6 Bangbae 1-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-843 / KR | ||
02 /
Cho, Hyon-Jong 204-1203, Sinnari 2-cha Apt., Okgye-dong, Gumi-si Gyeonbuk 730-380 / KR | |||
03 /
Lee, Sung-Young Ga-501, Saetbyeol Apt., 39, Songjeong-dong, Gumi-si Gyeongbuk 730-913 / KR | |||
04 /
Shin, Seung-Ho 48-38 bunji, Singil-2dong, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-838 / KR | |||
05 /
Lee, Hong-Woo 201-403, Greenvill Apt., 220, Doryang-dong, Gumi-si Gyeongbuk 730-020 / KR | Representative(s) | Stolmár, Matthias, et al Stolmár & Partner Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | [2013/36] |
Former [2009/32] | Scheele, Friedrich, et al Stolmár Scheele & Partner Patentanwälte Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/15] | Scheele, Friedrich, et al Stolmár Scheele Hinkelmann Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017323.0 | 01.10.2008 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | KR20070099804 | 04.10.2007 Original published format: KR 20070099804 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2045371 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2045371 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | [2010/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2045371 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/20, C30B29/06, C30B15/14 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
C30B15/14 (EP,US);
C30B15/20 (KR);
C30B15/203 (EP,US);
C30B15/206 (EP,US);
C30B29/06 (EP,US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2011/21] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Einkristallblock-Halbleiters mit sehr wenigen Fehlern | [2009/15] | English: | Method and apparatus for manufacturing an ultra low defect semiconductor single crystalline ingot | [2009/15] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour fabriquer un lingot monocristallin à semi-conducteur avec très peu de défauts | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 30.03.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1347083 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0058] , [0059] , [0063] - [0065] - [0067] * * figure 2 * [A] 4,5,9; | [XA]EP1650332 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] , [0050] , [0055] * * figures 3-5,7,8,10,11 * [A] 3,5,8,9; | [X]US2007151505 (CHO HYON-JONG [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * paragraphs [0026] , [0048] , [0063] * * abstract *; | [X]US2006016387 (YOKOYAMA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0180] , [0182] , [0183] * * abstract * * figure 15 * | by applicant | JP2005015296 | EP1347083 | EP1650332 | US2006016387 | US2007151505 | JP2004137093 |