EP2045228 - Process for making a refractory and refractory material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/15] | Process for making a refractory and refractory material obtained | ||
[2009/20] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drache Umwelttechnik GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 7-9 65582 Diez / DE | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marpert, Andreas Velener-Strasse 39b 46359 Helden / DE | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017380.0 | 02.10.2008 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | DE20071048118 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007048118 | DE20071048105 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007048105 | [2009/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2045228 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/15] | Classification | IPC: | C04B38/06, C04B33/135 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
C04B33/1352 (EP);
C04B35/18 (EP);
C04B35/565 (EP);
C04B35/62204 (EP);
C04B38/0615 (EP);
C04B2111/00793 (EP);
C04B2111/28 (EP);
C04B2235/3418 (EP);
C04B2235/349 (EP);
C04B2235/3826 (EP);
C04B2235/6027 (EP);
C04B2235/6562 (EP);
Y02P40/60 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0615, C04B33/135 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Feuerfestmaterials sowie Feuerfestmaterial | [2009/15] | English: | Process for making a refractory and refractory material | [2009/20] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de matériau refractaire ainsi que matériau réfractaire | [2009/15] |
Former [2009/15] | Process for making a refractory and refractory material obtained | Examination procedure | 02.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/43] | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |