EP2008580 - Wireless electrocardiograph system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeSync Corporation One East Broward Blvd. Suite 1701 Fort Lauderdale FL 33301 / US | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Istvan, Rud One east Broward Boulevard, Suite 1701 Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 / US | 02 /
Gregory, Bill 1200 SE 11 Court Fort Lauderdale, FL33316 / US | 03 /
Solovay, Kenneth 16732 Diamond Drive Weston, FL 33331 / US | 04 /
Chastain, David, Paul 21 Washington Drive Acton, MA 01720 / US | 05 /
Gundlach, John, David 23 Seneca Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 06 /
Hopman, Nicholas, C. 310 Eric Court Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US | 07 /
Williams, Daniel, L. 180 Prospect Street Norwell, MA 02061 / US | 08 /
Lodato, Franco 1816 Harbor View Circle Weston, FL 33327 / US | 09 /
Salem, Michael 1100 Humboldt Street Denver, CO 80218 / US | [2009/09] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
Istvan, Rud One east Broward Boulevard, Suite 1701 Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 / US | ||
02 /
Gregory, Bill 1200 SE 11 Court Fort Lauderdale, FL33316 / US | |||
03 /
Solovay, Kenneth 16732 Diamond Drive Weston, FL 33331 / US | |||
04 /
Chastain, David, Paul 21 Washington Drive Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
05 /
Gundlach, John, David 28 Conant Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
06 /
Hopman, Nicholas, C. 310 Eric Court Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US | |||
07 /
Williams, Daniel, L. 180 Prospect Street Norwell, MA 02061 / US | |||
08 /
Lodato, Franco 1816 Harbor View Circle Weston, FL 33327 / US | |||
09 /
Salem, Michael 2100 North Ocean Blvd, 904 Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33305 / US | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2015/10] |
Former [2009/01] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08017570.6 | 26.11.2002 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | US20010998733 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: US 998733 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2008580 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2008580 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2008580 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/0408 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
A61B5/0006 (EP,US);
A61B5/282 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/01] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2009/01] | Title | German: | Drahtloses elektrokardiographisches System | [2009/01] | English: | Wireless electrocardiograph system | [2009/01] | French: | Système d'électrocardiographe sans fil | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 13.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02794057.6 / EP1467651 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020794057) is 15.10.2004 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.06.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.03.2015 | BE | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | IT | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | IE | 26.11.2015 | LU | 26.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/45] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 26.11.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
SE | 04.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0459239 (LIFECOR INC [US]) [X] 1-29* columns 2-20 *; | [X]WO9401039 (SEGALOWITZ JACOB [US]) [X] 1-29 * pages 13-49 *; | [X]US5348008 (BORNN ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * columns 3-42 *; | [X]US5511553 (SEGALOWITZ JACOB [US]) [X] 1-29 * columns 9-46 *; | [X]US5704351 (MORTARA DAVID W [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * columns 3-28 *; | [X]WO0062664 (NEXAN LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-29 * pages 6-58 *; | [X]WO0062667 (NEXAN LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-29 * pages 3-16 * |