EP2056268 - Warning light for the visual display of at least one operating status [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WERMA Holding GmbH + Co. KG Dürbheimer Strasse 15 78604 Rietheim-Weilheim / DE | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Höhler, Christian Im Wiesengrund 7 78073 Bad Dürrheim / DE | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Roth, Klaus, et al Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Roth, Klaus, et al Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Roth, Klaus, et al Grosstobelerstrasse 39 88276 Ravensburg/Berg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017629.0 | 08.10.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | DE20071052377 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007052377 | [2009/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2056268 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2056268 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2056268 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G08B5/38 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
G08B5/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/18] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Warnleuchte zur visuellen Anzeige von wenigstens einem Betriebszustand | [2012/19] | English: | Warning light for the visual display of at least one operating status | [2009/19] | French: | Lampe de signalisation destinée à la signalisation visuelle d'au moins un état de fonctionnement | [2012/19] |
Former [2009/19] | Warnleuchte zur optischen Anzeige von wenigstens einem Betriebszustand | ||
Former [2009/19] | Lampe de signalisation destinée à la signalisation optique d'au moins un état de fonctionnement | Examination procedure | 22.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0450426 (INFEX AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,5,6,11,12,17,18 * column 1, lines 12-41 * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, lines 5-54 * * column 3, lines 2-20 * * figures 1a,1b,2,3 * [I] 4,7-10,13-16; | [XI]US2006274542 (GOULET RENE [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,6,11-17 * paragraphs [0018] - [0019] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] * * paragraph [0029] * * figures 1,3b * [I] 7-10 | Examination | US2004095253 | by applicant | DE102006015175 |