EP2011720 - Reinforcement structure of a vehicle body frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawai, Seiji Yamaha Hatsudoki K. K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
Sakai, Kouji Yamaha Hatsudoki K. K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | [2012/16] |
Former [2009/02] | 01 /
Sawai, Seiji Yamaha Hatsudoki K. K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
Sakai, Kouji Yamaha Hatsudoki K. K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017823.9 | 15.11.2001 | [2009/02] | Priority number, date | JP20000347574 | 15.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000347574 | JP20010248871 | 20.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001248871 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2011720 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2011720 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2011720 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/08, B62D27/04 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
B62D27/04 (EP,US);
B62D25/082 (EP,US);
B62D25/087 (EP,US);
B62D25/088 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/02] | B62D25/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/02] | Title | German: | Verstärkungsstruktur einer Fahrzeugkarosserie | [2009/02] | English: | Reinforcement structure of a vehicle body frame | [2009/02] | French: | Structure de renforcement de la carrosserie d'un véhicule | [2009/02] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01127160.8 / EP1209062 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010127160) is 05.03.2004 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.04.2012 | BE | 18.04.2012 | CY | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | NL | 18.04.2012 | TR | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.07.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | IE | 15.11.2012 | LU | 15.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2219840 (TOKICO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,8 * page 5, lines 8-27; figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]JPH05319307 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]EP0760437 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2,4; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0955228 (KARMANN GMBH W [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figures 2,4,5 *; | [XY]US6007123 (SCHWARTZ ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * column 3, lines 21-23; figures 5,6 * * column 4, lines 24-48 * [Y] 1,8 |