EP2051093 - Method and device for monitoring the integrity of satellite navigation signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrium GmbH Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | [2013/33] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Astrium GmbH 81663 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trautenberg, Hans L. Robert-Koch-Strasse 13 d 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Hummel, Adam Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Patentabteilung 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Hummel, Adam EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung 81663 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/17] | Hummel, Adam EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung 81663 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08018014.4 | 15.10.2008 | [2009/17] | Priority number, date | DE20071050034 | 17.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007050034 | [2009/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2051093 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2051093 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/20, G01S19/08 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
G01S19/08 (EP,US);
G01S19/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/17] | G01S1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2010/01] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Integritätsüberwachung von Satellitennavigationssignalen | [2009/17] | English: | Method and device for monitoring the integrity of satellite navigation signals | [2009/17] | French: | Procédé et dispositif destinés à la surveillance de l'intégrité de signaux de navigation par satellite | [2009/17] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.04.2013 | 16.04.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PAOLO D'ANGELO AND ANTONIO FERNANDEZ, "GNSS Multi-System Integrity Algorithm Definition and Evaluation", PROCEEDINGS OF ION GNSS 2007, FORT WORTH, TEXAS , USA, (20070925), pages 3057 - 3063, XP002505281 [X] 1-15 * figures 3,4 * * Seite 3059, Anfang des Abschnitts "EGNOS-Based Integrity Algorithm" - Seite 3062, Ende des Abschnitts "RAIM Consistency Check" * | [X] - PECCHIONI C ET AL, "Combined GALILEO and EGNOS Integrity Signal: a multisystem integrity algorithm", PROCEEDINGS OF GNSS SIGNAL 2007, NOORDWIJK, THE NEDERLANDS, (20070424), pages 1 - 11, XP002505280 [X] 1-15 * Seite 6, Anfang des Abschnitts "A new integrity monitoring ... " - Seite 9, Ende des Abschnitts "Input and output ..." * | [X] - OBER P B ET AL, "SBAS Integrity Verification", ION GPS/GNSS, XX, XX, (20010911), pages 1805 - 1830, XP002397832 [X] 1-15 * Seiten 1807-1808, Abschnitt "SBAS integrity concept" * | [X] - ZINK T ET AL, "Analyses of Integrity Monitoring Techniques for a Global Navigation Satellite System (GNSS-2)", ION ANNUAL MEETING, XX, XX, (20000626), pages 117 - 127, XP002343913 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * |