EP2063064 - A window covering safety device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whole Space Industries Ltd 11/F, 21, Sec. 6 Chung Hsiao E. Road Taipei / TW | [2013/33] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Whole Space Industries Ltd 11/F, 21, Sec. 6 Chung Hsiao E. Road Taipei / TW | ||
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states WholeSpace Industries, Inc. 11/F, 21, Sec. 6 Chung Hsiao E. Road Taipei / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tzong, Fu Lin 11/F, 21, Sec.6 Chung Hsiao E. Road Taipei / TW | [2013/33] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
Tzong, Fu Lin 11/F, 21, Sec.6 Chung Hsiao E. Road Taipei / TW | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/03] | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/16] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2009/22] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08018233.0 | 17.10.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | US20070975028 | 17.10.2007 Original published format: US 975028 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2063064 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2063064 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2063064 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/32, E06B9/325 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
E06B9/32 (EP,US);
E06B9/325 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3982 (US);
Y10T24/3993 (US)
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | E06B9/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung zum Abdecken von Fenstern | [2009/22] | English: | A window covering safety device | [2009/22] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité couvrant une fenêtre | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 19.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2008 | AT | 14.08.2013 | BE | 14.08.2013 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | ES | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | HR | 14.08.2013 | IT | 14.08.2013 | LT | 14.08.2013 | LV | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | MT | 14.08.2013 | PL | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | IE | 17.10.2013 | LU | 17.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | NO | 14.11.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | IS | 14.12.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 17.10.2008 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 17.10.2013 | ||
LU | 17.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 17.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 17.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 14.08.2013 | |
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 14.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003111190 (PALMER ROGER C [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0038]; figure 3 *; | [A]DE29514535U (MHZ HACHTEL & CO [DE]) [A] 1-20 * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 25; figures 1,2,3,4a,4b *; | [A]US6948546 (NIEN LESLIE [TW]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]US4727921 (VECCHIARELLI FRANCIS [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 17; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US4909298 | US5630458 | US6484787 | US6637493 | US7000672 | US6918425 | US7117918 | US5533559 | US6948546 | US4727921 | US5069264 |