EP2072253 - Method for controlling the tension of a sheet and/or the register [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schultze, Stephan Grlöserwiesenweg 4 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | 02 /
Schnabel, Holger Nordring 12 97228 Rottendorf / DE | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG BR/IPR Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG Intellectual Property Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 08018291.8 | 20.10.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | DE20071062454 | 22.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007062454 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2072253 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2072253 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/02, B41F23/04, B65H23/188, B65H43/00 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
B41F13/02 (EP,US);
B41F13/025 (EP,US);
B41F23/04 (EP,US);
B41F23/0403 (EP,US);
B41F23/0476 (EP,US);
B41F23/0479 (EP,US);
B65H23/1882 (EP,US);
B65H43/00 (EP,US);
B65H2301/5142 (EP,US);
B65H2301/517 (EP,US);
B65H2511/414 (EP,US);
B65H2515/31 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/414, B65H2220/02 (US,EP);
B65H2515/31, B65H2220/02 (US,EP);
B65H2515/40, B65H2220/02 (US,EP);
B65H2515/805, B65H2220/01 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2009/26] | B41F13/02, B41F23/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung einer Bahnspannung und/oder eines Registers | [2009/26] | English: | Method for controlling the tension of a sheet and/or the register | [2009/26] | French: | Procédé de réglage d'une tension de bande et/ou du registre | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10204484 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0023] , [0030] * * column 4, lines 62-64 *; | [X]DE19525170 (KOENIG & BAUER ALBERT AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 36 - line 58 * |