EP2179751 - Macroporous polymeric crosslinked materials, method for manufacture thereof and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stichting Dutch Polymer Institute John F. Kennedylaan 2 5612 AB Eindhoven / NL | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Ackermann, Joachim Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Ackermann Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | Ackermann, Joachim Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 08018399.9 | 21.10.2008 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2179751 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/56, C08F2/44, C08J9/00 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
C08J9/32 (EP);
A61L27/52 (EP);
A61L27/56 (EP);
C08F2/44 (EP);
C08F8/00 (EP);
C08J9/0061 (EP);
C08J9/26 (EP);
C08J9/28 (EP);
C08F2800/10 (EP);
C08F2800/20 (EP);
C08J2201/046 (EP);
C08J2201/052 (EP);
C08J2333/06 (EP);
C08J2333/26 (EP);
C08J2400/14 (EP);
C08J2489/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F293/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Makroporöse Polymervernetzungsmaterialien, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Verwendung | [2010/17] | English: | Macroporous polymeric crosslinked materials, method for manufacture thereof and use | [2010/17] | French: | Matériaux réticulés polymériques macroporeux, procédé de fabrication correspondant et utilisation | [2010/17] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/41] | 30.05.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4575539 (DECROSTA MARK T [US], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [X]US6897271 (DOMSCHKE ANGELIKA MARIA [US], et al) [X] 1,16 * column 1, lines 55,56; claims 1-7 * * column 4, lines 1-28 * * column 5, lines 31-42 * * column 6, lines 1-13,50; examples 1-10 *; | [X]WO2007053955 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CA], et al) [X] 14 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014]; claims 1,22 *; | [X] - OXLEY H R ET AL, "Macroporous hydrogels for biomedical applications: methodology and morphology", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 14, no. 14, ISSN 0142-9612, (19931101), pages 1064 - 1072, (19931101), XP024141470 [X] 1,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0142-9612(93)90207-I | by applicant | WO9851408 | - A. COOPER ET AL., ADVANCED MATERIALS, (1999), vol. 11, no. 15, pages 1270 - 4 | - L. GEMA ET AL., J. MAT. SCI., MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, (2004), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 463 - 7 | - B. MANOHAR ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (1993), vol. 14, no. 14, pages 1059 - 63 | - K. HYE-WON ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (1999), vol. 20, no. 14, pages 1339 - 44 | - TISSUE ENGINEERING, (2008), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 41 - 48 | - PHARM. RES., (1991), vol. 8, pages 713 - 720 | - DRUG DEVELOPMENT AND INDUSTRIAL PHARMACY, (2001), vol. 27, no. 8, pages 825 - 829 | - EUROPEAN PHYSICAL JOURNAL B: CONDENSED MATTER PHYSICS, (1999), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 59 - 69 | - BIOMEDICAL MICRODEVICES, (2007), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 855 - 862 | - CYTOMETRY, (1997), vol. 28, pages 141 - 146 |