EP2055599 - Vehicle behavior control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Kuniyoshi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
Tanaka, Kuniyoshi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / DE | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann, Patentanwälte, Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08018408.8 | 21.10.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | JP20070281127 | 30.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007281127 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055599 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2055599 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/02, B60W10/18, B60W10/20 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
B60W30/02 (EP,US);
B60W50/06 (EP,US);
B62D6/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/38] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung des Fahrzeugverhaltens | [2009/19] | English: | Vehicle behavior control apparatus | [2009/19] | French: | Appareil de contrôle du comportement du véhicule | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 27.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005125122 (KNOOP MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0045] * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4340932 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2004158377 (MATSUMOTO SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0102] * * figures 1,7A-7D *; | [DA]JP2005112007 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD) [DA] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * | by applicant | JP2007281127 | JP2005112007 |