EP2053439 - MACRO LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/18] | Macro lens | ||
[2021/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qioptiq Photonics GmbH & Co. KG Königsallee 23 37081 Göttingen / DE | [2022/13] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states Qioptiq Photonics GmbH & Co. KG Königsallee 23 37081 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states Witold, Hackemer Kurt-Schumacher-Weg 16 37434 Gieboldehausen / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Jos. Schneider Optische Werke GmbH Ringstrasse 132 55543 Bad Kreuznach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hackemer, Witold Nassenbeurer Weg 3 55595 Bockenau / DE | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2022/13] |
Former [2014/38] | Schneider, Peter Christian, et al Fiedler, Ostermann & Schneider Patentanwälte Obere Karspüle 41 37073 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | Köllner, Malte Köllner & Partner Patentanwälte Vogelweidstrasse 8 60596 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 08018631.5 | 24.10.2008 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | DE20071051620 | 26.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007051620 | [2009/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2053439 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2053439 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B15/24, G02B9/34, G02B13/24 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
G02B13/24 (EP,US);
G02B15/24 (EP,US);
G02B9/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/18] | G02B13/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2022/13] |
Former [2010/11] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2010/01] | |||
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MAKRO-OBJEKTIV | [2021/43] | English: | MACRO LENS | [2021/43] | French: | OBJECTIF MACRO | [2021/43] |
Former [2009/18] | Makro-Objektiv | ||
Former [2009/18] | Macro lens | ||
Former [2009/18] | Objectif macro | Examination procedure | 06.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees IT, GB, FR, ES, DE | 04.02.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 04.02.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.02.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 04.02.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 04.02.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.02.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2014 | 31.10.2020 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 30.03.2022 | [2022/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0440405 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2006164540 (KAYANUMA YASUAKI [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] , [0040] , [0041]; figure 2 *; | [A]US5644433 (IKARI KAZUO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DD207268 | US3941457 | - "Optique geometrique generaleIn Handbuch der Physik", MARECHAL, A, Grundlagen der Optik, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1956), vol. XXIV | - DIETZSCH, E., ZUR TIEFENABBILDUNG DER PUPILLE FEINGERäTETECHNIK, (1977), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 3 - 5 | - WYNNE, C.G., PROC. PHYS. SOC., (1952), vol. 65B, pages 429 - 437 | - "Optique geometrique generale In Handbuch der Physik", MARECHAL, A.; S. FLÜGGE, Grundlagen der Optik, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1956), vol. XXIV |