EP2182599 - Corrugated plastic pipe especially for covering electric lines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLEMMER GMBH Gruber Strasse 48 85586 Poing / DE | [2016/42] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states SCHLEMMER GMBH Gruber Strasse 48 85586 Poing / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chu, Van-Ngoc Goldnesselweg 61 85586 Poing / DE | 02 /
Cenadi, Laurentiu Lindenweg 4 97437 Hassfurt / DE | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/18] | Geyer, Fehners & Partner Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08018996.2 | 30.10.2008 | [2010/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2182599 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2182599 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
H02G3/0468 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, PL, PT, RO [2016/42] |
Former [2011/02] | CZ, DE, FR, PL, PT, RO | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wellrohr aus Kunststoff, insbesondere zum Ummanteln elektrischer Leitungen | [2010/18] | English: | Corrugated plastic pipe especially for covering electric lines | [2010/18] | French: | Tuyau ondulé en plastique, notamment destiné à recouvrir des câbles électriques | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2009 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 02.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 07.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 19.10.2016 | PL | 19.10.2016 | RO | 19.10.2016 | PT | 20.02.2017 | [2017/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2003079021 (YAZAKI CORP) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19700916 (HEGLER RALPH PETER DR ING [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 3, lines 5-56; figures 1-3,7-9 *; | [A]EP0860921 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 43 - column 8, line 8; figures 1-10 * | by applicant | DE3246594 | DE19641421 | DE19705761 | DE3405552 |