EP2067702 - Automatic labelling machine for linerless labels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pago AG Werdenstrasse 85 9472 Grabs / St. Gallen / CH | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saluz, Rodolfo Steinweg 3 9470 Buchs / CH | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | ||
Former [2009/24] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019401.2 | 06.11.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | DE20071058765 | 06.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007058765 | [2009/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2067702 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2067702 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/18 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
B65C9/1803 (EP,US);
B65C9/1815 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1378 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Title | German: | Etikettierautomat für Linerless-Etiketten | [2009/24] | English: | Automatic labelling machine for linerless labels | [2009/24] | French: | Automate d'étiquetage pour étiquettes sans bande de support | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 20.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE MULTIVAC Marking & Inspection GmbH & Co. KG Kupferweg 5 32130 Enger / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE MULTIVAC Marking & Inspection GmbH & Co. KG Kupferweg 5 32130 Enger / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | 04.10.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.02.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.08.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2014 | 16.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.09.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/07] | 10.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2008 | CH | 23.11.2011 | CY | 23.11.2011 | CZ | 23.11.2011 | DK | 23.11.2011 | EE | 23.11.2011 | FI | 23.11.2011 | HR | 23.11.2011 | IE | 23.11.2011 | LI | 23.11.2011 | LT | 23.11.2011 | LV | 23.11.2011 | MT | 23.11.2011 | NL | 23.11.2011 | PL | 23.11.2011 | SE | 23.11.2011 | SI | 23.11.2011 | SK | 23.11.2011 | TR | 23.11.2011 | BG | 23.02.2012 | NO | 23.02.2012 | GR | 24.02.2012 | ES | 05.03.2012 | IS | 23.03.2012 | PT | 23.03.2012 | LU | 06.11.2012 | BE | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2015/20] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 06.11.2008 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/38] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 23.11.2011 | |
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NO | 23.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3865671 (KRONSEDER HERMANN [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7* column 3, lines 21-67; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0858422 (MOORES BUSINESS FORMS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * paragraphs [0008] , [0012] - [0015] - [0018]; figure 6 *; | [X]GB2379918 (SOVEREIGN LABELLING SYS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,4,6,7 * page 5, lines 12-30 * * page 6, lines 15-28 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US7293592 (GOLICZ ROMAN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-9 * column 5, lines 17-31 * * column 6, lines 14-37 * * column 7, lines 15-48 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE69617386T | WO2005023654 | DE10351877 |