EP2034039 - Metallic film and method of its manufacture and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hueck Folien Ges.m.b.H. Gewerbepark 30 4342 Baumgartenberg / AT | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kastner, Friedrich Untersteinbach 17 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | 02 /
Bergsmann, Dr. Martin Martinelligang 11 4020 Linz / AT | 03 /
Hillburger, Johann Hangstrasse 18 92712 Pirk / DE | 04 /
Einsiedler, Ronald Volksgartenstrasse 6 4020 Linz / AT | 05 /
Treutlein, Roland Pirkmühle 13 92712 Pirk / DE | [2009/18] |
Former [2009/11] | 01 /
Kastner, Friedrich Untersteinbach 17 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | ||
02 /
Bergsmann, Martin Steiglandweg 7 4060 Leonberg / AT | |||
03 /
Hillburger, Johann Hangstrasse 18 92712 Pirk / DE | |||
04 /
Einsiedler, Ronald Baumgartenberg 4342 Baumgartenberg 78/4 / AT | |||
05 /
Treutlein, Roland Pirkmühle 13 92712 Pirk / DE | Representative(s) | Hagemeier, Annette Patentanwältin Wildmoosstraße 19 82194 Gröbenzell / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Hagemeier, Annette Patentanwältin Wildmoosstraße 19 82194 Gröbenzell / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | Hagemeier, Annette Patentanwältin Wildmoosstraße 19 82194 Gröbenzell / DE | ||
Former [2009/11] | Hagemeier, Annette Dr. Annette Hagemeier Patentanwältin Fachastrasse 7 85232 Bergkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019431.9 | 09.08.2001 | [2009/11] | Priority number, date | DE2000217392U | 09.10.2000 Original published format: DE 20017392 U | [2009/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2034039 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2034039 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/02, C23C14/04, H05K3/04, G06K19/077, H01Q1/22 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
C23C14/022 (EP,US);
B42D25/373 (US);
C23C14/042 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
H01Q1/22 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2208 (EP,US);
H05K3/048 (EP,US);
B42D2033/10 (EP);
B42D2033/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/11] | C23C14/02, C23C14/04, H05K3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/11] | Title | German: | Metallisierte Folie und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung sowie deren Anwendung | [2009/11] | English: | Metallic film and method of its manufacture and use | [2009/11] | French: | Film métallisé et son procédé de fabrication et d'utilisation | [2009/11] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01960161.6 / EP1332238 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010960161) is 28.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.06.2012 | NL | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | IE | 09.08.2012 | LU | 09.08.2012 | BE | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/27] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | GR | 21.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4354911 (DODD THOMAS C, et al) [A] 1-12* column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 49 *; | [Y]US4402998 (KUMAGAI HENRY Y [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 61 *; | [X]US4622106 (KITAGAWA NAOAKI [JP]) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 24 *; | [A]EP0475145 (SHELDAHL INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, lines 3-8 * * page 5, line 1 - page 8, line 51 *; | [Y]WO9919152 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 21 * * page 4, lines 7-17 * * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 10 * * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 28 * * figures 3a,3b * | by applicant | US4242378 | EP0107983 | US4685997 | DE3610379 | US4863808 | EP0330733 | EP0479058 | DE3687250T | EP0600374 | DE19643823 | DE19718177 | DE19729891 | WO9913157 | DE19815175 | DE19812932 | DE19818968 | DE19822075 | DE19834348 |