EP2060448 - Rollover protection for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISE Automotive GmbH Othestraße 19 51702 Bergneustadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states ISE Automotive GmbH Othestrasse 19 51702 Bergneustadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liesaus, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. In der Bockemühle 51 51702 Bergneustadt / DE | 02 /
Wacker, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing. Sendschotter Weg 1 57489 Drolshagen / DE | 03 /
Beki, Gürkan Broicherweg 15 51766 Engelskirchen / DE | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019471.5 | 07.11.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | DE20071054254 | 14.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007054254 | [2009/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060448 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/13 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
B60R21/13 (EP);
B60R2021/135 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/04] |
Former [2009/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Überrollschutzsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2009/21] | English: | Rollover protection for motor vehicles | [2009/21] | French: | Système de protection contre les tonneaux pour des véhicules automobiles | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/20] | 04.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102005028871 (KARMANN GMBH W [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE10316346 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE10044927 (ISE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE19712955 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | DE19952125 | DE10040642 |