EP2061056 - MEMS switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2015/40] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikami, Mayumi c/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co.,Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | 02 /
Izumi, Konami c/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co.,Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2015/40] |
Former [2009/21] | 01 /
Mikami, Mayumi Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co.,Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | ||
02 /
Izumi, Konami Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co.,Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/40] |
Former [2009/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019774.2 | 12.11.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | JP20070293964 | 13.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007293964 | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2061056 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2061056 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2061056 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01H59/00 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
H01H59/0009 (EP,US);
H01H2059/0072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2015/40] |
Former [2010/45] | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2009/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MEMS-Schalter | [2009/21] | English: | MEMS switch | [2009/21] | French: | Commutateur MEMS | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 04.09.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 30.09.2015 | NL | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.11.2015 | GB | 30.12.2015 | [2016/50] |
Former [2016/47] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 30.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5578976 (YAO JUN J [US]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-15,17 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003222321 (YANG WOO-SEOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-3,6-8,12 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP1150318 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] * figure 7b * | Examination | US7101724 | EP1146533 | by applicant | JP2005528751 | JP2003217423 | JP2007293964 |