EP2063208 - Heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU, MT, NO, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consarctic Entwicklungs- und Handels GmbH Postfach 1133 63821 Schöllkrippen / DE | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Been, Raymond J. Postfach 1104 63821 Schöllkrippen / DE | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Säger, Manfred Säger & Hofmann Patent AG Feldgüetliweg 130 8706 Meilen (ZH) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Säger, Manfred Säger & Hofmann Partner AG Feldgüetliweg 130 8706 Meilen (ZH) / CH | ||
Former [2009/22] | Säger, Manfred European Patent Attorney P.O. Box 5 7404 Maienfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 08020005.8 | 17.11.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | DE20072016275U | 20.11.2007 Original published format: DE 202007016275 U | [2009/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2063208 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2063208 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2063208 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/12, F28F1/00, F28F13/06, F28D7/10, // F28D21/00 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
F28D7/12 (EP);
F28D7/103 (EP);
F28F1/00 (EP);
F28F13/06 (EP);
F28D2021/0033 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/17] | F28D7/12, F28F1/00, F28F13/06, F28D7/10 | ||
Former IPC [2009/22] | F28D7/12, F28F1/00, F28F13/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher | [2009/22] | English: | Heat exchanger | [2009/22] | French: | Échangeur de chaleur | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 03.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2008 | BG | 25.03.2015 | CY | 25.03.2015 | CZ | 25.03.2015 | DK | 25.03.2015 | EE | 25.03.2015 | ES | 25.03.2015 | FI | 25.03.2015 | HR | 25.03.2015 | IT | 25.03.2015 | LT | 25.03.2015 | LV | 25.03.2015 | MC | 25.03.2015 | MT | 25.03.2015 | NL | 25.03.2015 | PL | 25.03.2015 | RO | 25.03.2015 | SE | 25.03.2015 | SI | 25.03.2015 | SK | 25.03.2015 | TR | 25.03.2015 | NO | 25.06.2015 | GR | 26.06.2015 | IS | 25.07.2015 | PT | 27.07.2015 | IE | 17.11.2015 | LU | 17.11.2015 | BE | 30.11.2015 | [2017/38] |
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 17.11.2015 | ||
LU | 17.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 17.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3765189 (LE DIOURON R) [X] 1 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 56; figure 1 * [I] 13; | [XYI]GB474826 (JOHN CRONIN HERSEY) [X] 1,3,9,13 * page 1, column 1, line 9 - line 27; figures 1-4 * * page 1, column 2, line 68 - page 2, column 1, line 5 * * page 2, column 2, line 110 - line 130 * * page 3, column 1, line 39 - line 58 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 4,5; | [XI]US2791104 (ANGEL DUZ) [X] 1,14 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 30; figures 1-3 * [I] 13; | [YA]DE19650086 (FOERSTER HANS DR ING [DE]) [Y] 7,8 * figures 2, 3; claims 1-2 * [A] 1,2; | [X]US3907028 (LAWSON DREW B) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 13 - line 57; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE592821 (EDUARD AHLBORN AKT GES) [A] 1,3-5,7,8 * figure 1 * | by applicant | GB474826 |