EP2025355 - Container for use during dialysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dumon d'Ayot, François Montée du gourguillon 69005 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Dupin, Thierry 6 lotissement les cerisiers 69690 Besseway / FR | 03 /
Laffay, Philippe 30 Allée Buffon 69110 Sainte Fou Les Lyon / FR | 04 /
Graf, Thomas, Dr. Im Langenfeld 14 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2009/13] |
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
Dumon d'Ayot, François Montée du gourguillon 69005 Lyon / FR | ||
02 /
Dupin, Thierry 6 lotissement les cerisiers 69690 Besseway / FR | |||
03 /
Laffay, Philippe 30 Allée Buffon 69110 Sainte Fou Les Lyon / FR | |||
04 /
Graf, Thomas, Dr. Rotaval 69380 H. Jean Des Vigues / FR | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08020073.6 | 16.07.2002 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | DE20011052105 | 23.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10152105 | [2009/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2025355 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2025355 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2025355 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/16 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
A61M1/1656 (EP,US);
A61M1/14 (KR);
A61M1/1666 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/167 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Behältnis zur Verwendung in der Dialyse | [2009/08] | English: | Container for use during dialysis | [2009/08] | French: | Récipient destiné à l'utilisation en dialyse | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02762365.1 / EP1438090 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020762365) is 10.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.05.2012 | EE | 30.05.2012 | LU | 16.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2019/29] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
LU | 16.07.2012 | ||
TR | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0475825 (SOLUDIA SA [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 2, line 18 - line 47 * * column 3, line 27 - line 43; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,5; | [Y]EP0484751 (MILES INC [US]) [Y] 4 * page 5, line 30 - line 36 *; | [YD]US5385564 (SLATER GLENN L [US], et al) [YD] 2 * abstract *; | [A]US5387237 (FOURNIER RONALD L [US], et al) [A] 4,5 * column 6, line 41 - line 53; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0665026 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [A] * abstract *; | [XY]FR2766797 (SMAD [FR]) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * * page 3, line 20 - line 28 * * page 4, line 3 - line 12 * * page 4, line 35 - line 32 * * page 7, line 4 - line 24 * [Y] 4,5 | by applicant | US5385564 |