EP2083489 - Connection element to electrically connect an LED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | (Expected) limited patent specification | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BJB GmbH & Co. KG Werler Strasse 1 59755 Arnsberg / DE | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogt, Karl-Wilhelm Am Winkel 10 59469 Ense / DE | 02 /
Tauber, Daniel Sophie-Scholl-Strasse 17 58636 Iserlohn / DE | 03 /
Plikun, Freddi Südstrasse 31 59757 Arnsberg / DE | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Ostriga Sonnet Wirths & Vorwerk Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Ostriga Sonnet Wirths & Vorwerk Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2012/19] | Ostriga Sonnet Wirths & Vorwerk Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2009/31] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 08020414.2 | 25.11.2008 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | DE20081005823 | 24.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008005823 | [2009/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2083489 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2083489 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/39] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP2083489 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01R33/00 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
H01R13/2442 (EP,US);
H01R4/48185 (US);
H01R12/714 (EP,US);
H01R13/6215 (EP,US);
H01R4/4848 (EP);
H01R13/7175 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2009/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anschlusselement zur elektrischen Anbindung einer LED | [2009/31] | English: | Connection element to electrically connect an LED | [2009/31] | French: | Elément de raccordement destiné au raccordement électrique d'une DEL | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 22.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Limitations: | 21.09.2016 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 16.06.2017 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 06.07.2017 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | 19.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2008 | CY | 26.09.2012 | CZ | 26.09.2012 | DK | 26.09.2012 | EE | 26.09.2012 | FI | 26.09.2012 | HR | 26.09.2012 | LT | 26.09.2012 | LV | 26.09.2012 | MT | 26.09.2012 | PL | 26.09.2012 | RO | 26.09.2012 | SE | 26.09.2012 | SI | 26.09.2012 | SK | 26.09.2012 | TR | 26.09.2012 | IE | 25.11.2012 | LU | 25.11.2012 | BE | 30.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | FR | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | BG | 26.12.2012 | NO | 26.12.2012 | GR | 27.12.2012 | ES | 06.01.2013 | IS | 26.01.2013 | PT | 28.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MT | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
LU | 25.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MT | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MT | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CZ | 26.09.2012 | |
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 26.09.2012 | |
NO | 26.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1496551 (NICHIA CORP [JP]); | [XA]US2007109806 (TSUKAMOTO HIRONORI [JP], et al); | [XA]US2007171662 (TOKIDA TSUKASA [JP]); | [XA]US7258466 (WATANABE SHIGEYUKI [JP], et al); | [XA]EP1832804 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | DE8711882U | US2003183417 | DE102004004779 | US7182627 | US2007070631 |