EP2068390 - Battery system with battery cells arranged in array alignment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka, 570-8677 / JP | [2013/41] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states SANYO Electric Techno Create Co., Ltd. 5-5 Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Wataru c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Hideo c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Shinsuke c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 04 /
Omura, Tomoyuki c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Hertz, Oliver V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Hertz, Oliver v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08020558.6 | 26.11.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | JP20070308092 | 28.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007308092 | JP20070308998 | 29.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007308998 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2068390 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/60, H01M2/10, H01M2/02, H01M10/613, H01M10/617, H01M10/625, H01M10/647, H01M10/6557, H01M10/6567, H01M10/6569 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/617 (EP,US);
H01M10/647 (EP,US);
H01M10/6557 (EP,US);
H01M10/6567 (EP,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/289 (EP,US);
H01M10/6569 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/33] | H01M10/50, H01M2/10, H01M2/02 | ||
Former IPC [2009/24] | H01M10/50, H01M2/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2010/07] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Batteriesystem mit in Bereichsausrichtung angeordneten Batteriezellen | [2009/24] | English: | Battery system with battery cells arranged in array alignment | [2009/24] | French: | Système de batterie avec des cellules de batterie agencées dans un alignement de réseau | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 21.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 31.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 05.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5678760 (MUSO MASANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* claims 1-3 *; | [X]US6512347 (HELLMANN JOHN VINCENT [US], et al) [X] 1,17,19,20 * figures 1,2; claims 1,3,11,12,14 *; | [PX]EP1990860 (VALEO KLIMASYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-4 * paragraphs [0010] , [0025]; figure 1; claims 1-37 * | by applicant | US6512347 |