EP2073051 - Device for shaping laser radiation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIMO Patentverwaltung GmbH & Co. KG Bookenburgweg 4-8 44319 Dortmund / DE | [2012/33] |
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states LIMO Patentverwaltung GmbH & Co. KG Dorfstrasse 12 36419 Gerstengrund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartoschewski, Daniel Grosse Hauwe 36 45883 Gelsenkirchen / DE | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Basfeld, Rainer, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 1580 59705 Arnsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Basfeld, Rainer, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08020687.3 | 28.11.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | DE20071061358 | 19.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007061358 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2073051 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2073051 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/09 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
G02B19/0057 (EP,US);
G02B19/0014 (EP,US);
G02B27/0966 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Formung von Laserstrahlung | [2009/26] | English: | Device for shaping laser radiation | [2009/26] | French: | Dispositif destiné à la formation de rayons laser | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 03.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 27.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0042465 (KONG HONG JIN [KR]) [Y] 6,7,11,12* figures 5,6 *; | [Y]DE10118788 (LISSOTSCHENKO VITALIJ [DE], et al) [Y] 5 * figure - *; | [X]US2005063428 (ANIKITCHEV SERGUEI G [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * figure 1 *; | [XD]WO2005085934 (HENTZE LISSOTSCHENKO PATENTVER [DE], et al) [XD] 1 * page 1, lines 11-12 *; | [XY]US6952510 (KARLSEN SCOTT R [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 3, lines 18-39 * * column 4, lines 27-53; figures 3,6 * [Y] 5-7,11,12; | [X]WO2007078456 (MIND MELTERS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2a * | Examination | WO2007122886 | US2009059567 | by applicant | DE10106155 | DE10118788 | US2005063428 | WO2005085934 | US6952510 |